8Speed8, Inc. et al v. Snell & Wilmer, LLP et al
Plaintiff: 8Speed8, Inc
Defendant: Snell & Wilmer, LLP
Appellant: 8Speed8, Inc. and Vibe Micro, Inc.
Appellee: SIG Capital, LLC, United States Trustee, Karla Guarino, Payteller, LLC, Luxor Entertainment, LLC and Igor Shabanets
Trustee: United States Trustee, Las Vegas
Case Number: 2:2016cv01531
Filed: June 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 Filing 25 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #24 Order addressed to Payteller, LLC, Michael G. Park, Registered Agent. (DRM)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting ECF No. #23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney : Robert M. Charles, Jr withdrawn from the case as counsel for Payteller, LLC. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/17/2018. (Copy of instant order also mailed to Yves Yon, President Payteller, LLC, on 7/18/2018, to address specified within order.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 18, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert M. Charles, Jr. for Appellee Payteller, LLC. (Charles, Robert)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that the Bankruptcy Court's denial of Appellants' Show Cause Motion is reversed. This case is remanded to the bankruptcy court for further proceedings consistent with this decision. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 6, 2016 Filing 20 RESPONSE to 19 Minute Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, Re: Registration with CM/ECF System filed by Appellants 8Speed8, Inc., Vibe Micro, Inc.. (Ales, Barney)
December 5, 2016 Filing 21 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as addressed - unable to forward" re ECF No. 19 Minute Order, addressed to Payteller, LLC. (KW)
December 5, 2016 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 12/5/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The Clerk's office has mailed two notices of Non-Compliance with LR IC 2-1 to Attorney Geoffrey Ittleman (ECF Nos. 14 and 17 .) Attorney Geoffrey Ittleman ordered to show cause, by 12/19/2016, as to why the Court should not impose sanctions for failure to comply with LR IC 2-1. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
November 10, 2016 Filing 18 JOINDER to #13 Answering Brief ; filed by Appellee Payteller, LLC. (Charles, Robert)
November 9, 2016 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 11/9/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. (2nd Notice) Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1: that Geoffrey Ittleman is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website to register for CM/ECF. Failure to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing program may result in the submission to the Court for issuance of an order to show cause. ( Notice of Compliance re: LR IC 2-1 is due by 11/23/2016.) (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
October 18, 2016 Filing 16 JOINDER to #13 Answering Brief ; filed by Appellees SIG Capital, LLC, Igor Shabanets. (Went, Joseph)
October 3, 2016 Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF by Appellants 8Speed8, Inc., Vibe Micro, Inc., In Re 8Speed8, Inc. re #10 Opening Brief, #11 Appendix, #13 Answering Brief. (Ales, Barney)
September 23, 2016 Filing 14 (1st Notice) Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1: that Geoffrey Ittleman is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website to register for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ)
September 14, 2016 Filing 13 ANSWERING BRIEF by Appellee Snell & Wilmer, LLP re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Appellee Snell & Wilmer, LLP (Exhibits 1 - 5))(Hamm, Gabrielle)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Geoffrey Ittleman and approving Designation of Local Counsel Barney C. Ales. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 08/29/2016. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 29, 2016 Filing 11 APPENDIX to #10 Opening Brief ; filed by Appellants 8Speed8, Inc., Vibe Micro, Inc., In Re 8Speed8, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K - M (pages 101-273), #2 Exhibit N - W (pages 274-448))(Ales, Barney)
August 29, 2016 Filing 10 OPENING BRIEF by Appellants 8Speed8, Inc., Vibe Micro, Inc., In Re 8Speed8, Inc. re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Ales, Barney)
August 26, 2016 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT Re: #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice In This Case Only By Attorney Not Admitted To The Bar of this Court by Appellants 8Speed8, Inc., Vibe Micro, Inc., In Re 8Speed8, Inc.. (Ales, Barney) Modified on 8/29/2016 add link. (WJ).
August 15, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #7 Verified Petition,. Attorney Geoffrey Ittleman advised to comply with LR IA 11-2(b)(3) and file your certificate of good standing. Please link your certificate to document ECF No. #7 as a notice to avoid paying the filing fee twice. (no image attached)(WJ)
August 12, 2016 Filing 7 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Geoffrey Ittleman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Barney C. Ales (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4239924) filed by Appellants 8Speed8, Inc., Vibe Micro, Inc., In Re 8Speed8, Inc. . (Ales, Barney)
August 12, 2016 Filing 6 (1st Notice) Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1: that Geoffrey D. Ittleman is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website to register for CM/ECF. (WJ)
August 11, 2016 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 8/11/2016. IT IS ORDERED that the appellant shall have a period of 14 days from the date of this order to file/serve an opening brief. Appellee shall have 14 days after to file/serve an answering brief. Thereafter, appellant shall have 14 days to file/serve a final reply brief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall file and serve excerpts of the record as an appendix to the appellant brief pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(b) and LR IC 2-2. Appellee may also file/serve an appendix with appellee brief which contains required material omitted by appellant. Opening brief due by 8/28/2016. Answering brief due by 9/14/2016. Reply brief due by 10/1/2016.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 11, 2016 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Readiness re Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Amended Ntc Referral, #2 Amended Transmittal)(JC)
June 28, 2016 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 6/28/2016. IT IS ORDERED that the designation of reporters and recorders transcripts (if any) as required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) shall be filed with the clerk of bankruptcy court so the certificate of readiness may be transmitted timely to the district court. If the designation was previously filed with the clerk of BAP, counsel shall file a copy of the same with the clerk of bankruptcy court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future documents filed in connection with this appeal shall bear the bankruptcy case number, adversary case number (if any) and the district court civil case number. For Bankruptcy Appeals, Attorneys are required to file Verified Petitions in accordance with LR IA 11-2. Verified Petition due by 8/12/2016.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 28, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Geoffrey D. Ittleman to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 8/12/2016. (no image attached) (MMM)
June 24, 2016 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, Bankruptcy Court case number 13-20371-led; Appeal Reference Number: 16-37. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Referral, #2 Appeal Memorandum, #3 Transmittal Form to USDC)(MMM)
June 24, 2016 Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du. (MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 8Speed8, Inc. et al v. Snell & Wilmer, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snell & Wilmer, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 8Speed8, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: 8Speed8, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey David Ittleman
Represented By: Barney C Ales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Vibe Micro, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey David Ittleman
Represented By: Barney C Ales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SIG Capital, LLC
Represented By: Eric S Pezold
Represented By: Joseph G. Went
Represented By: Robert R. Kinas
Represented By: David A Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: United States Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Karla Guarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Payteller, LLC
Represented By: Robert M. Charles, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Luxor Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Eric S Pezold
Represented By: Robert R. Kinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Igor Shabanets
Represented By: Zachariah Larson
Represented By: Joseph G. Went
Represented By: Matthew C Zirzow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustee, Las Vegas
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?