Martinez v. Baker et al
Plaintiff: Robert C. Martinez
Defendant: Renee Baker, Harold M. Byrne, Barbara K. Cegavske, James Greg Cox, Michael Fletcher, John Doe Investigator, Adam Paul Laxalt, Joshua M. Miller, John M. Oxborrow, Jacob W. Parr, Brian Sandoval and Joshua C. Sasser
Case Number: 2:2016cv01546
Filed: June 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting 78 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 73 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/6/2018. The parties shall file a joint pretrial order within thirty (30) days after the Court issues a ruling on the motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER that 67 Stipulation to Extend Deadline is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 57 Motion to Extend Time by an Additional 30 Days to Answer/Respond re 53 Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that 32 Motion to Extend the Deadline to Effectuate Service and for Service by Publication is GRANTED. The deadline to serve Mr. Sasser by publication is extended by 60 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that 34 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Discovery is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Court will not issue a screening order in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall proceed on the normal litigation track as guided by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold M. Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara K. Cegavske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Greg Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Investigator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Paul Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Oxborrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob W. Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua C. Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C. Martinez
Represented By: Jeanette H. Barrick
Represented By: Travis N Barrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?