Quick v. Clark County et al
Plaintiff: Michael Quick
Defendant: Peter M Boffelli, Jr. and Clark County, Nevada
Case Number: 2:2016cv01554
Filed: June 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting Defendants' 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request) re 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Responses due by 10/27/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Responses due by 10/10/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Emergency Motion to reopen discovery to conduct three depositions. Discovery due by 7/31/2017. Motions due by 8/30/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting Defendants' 18 Emergency Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation. The Early Neutral Evaluation is continued to 3/10/2017 at 09:30 AM in LV Chambers, Room 3071, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Confidential ENE sta tements are due to Chambers, Room 3071, no later than 4:00 p.m., 3/3/2017. All other instructions within the original 17 Order shall remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying without prejudice the parties' 9 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The parties shall file a new proposed discovery plan and scheduling order that complies with the local rules no later than 10/14/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quick v. Clark County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter M Boffelli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County, Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Quick
Represented By: Jennifer D. Golanics
Represented By: Andrew L Rempfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?