Hunt/Penta et al v. Aon Risk Services South, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Hunt/Penta |
Defendant: |
Aon Risk Services South, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv01563 |
Filed: |
July 1, 2016 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy J. Koppe |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 9, 2018 |
Filing
127
ORDER Granting 126 Motion to Extend Time Re: 110 Motion for Judgment. Replies due by 10/16/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
August 16, 2018 |
Filing
93
ORDER Granting 92 Motion to Extend Time Re: 87 Motion in Limine. Responses due by 8/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
August 15, 2018 |
Filing
91
ORDER Granting 90 Motion to Remove Attorney from Service List. Attorney E. Daniel Kidd terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
August 24, 2017 |
Filing
80
ORDER Granting 78 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
May 3, 2017 |
Filing
72
ORDER Denying 62 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
April 20, 2017 |
Filing
69
ORDER Granting 68 Motion for Leave to File. Third-party Plaintiff's reply to 62 the motion to compel is dueno later than 4/24/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
February 13, 2017 |
Filing
53
ORDER Granting 52 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines re 49 Motion to Dismiss. ( Responses due by 3/3/2017., Replies due by 4/7/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
December 20, 2016 |
Filing
46
PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 45 Proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
December 19, 2016 |
Filing
47
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
November 15, 2016 |
Filing
43
ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation to Extend Third Party Defendant's Time to Respond to Third Party Complaint. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
October 24, 2016 |
Filing
36
ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation. Hunt/Penta answer due 11/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing
32
ORDER Granting 31 Motion to Continue Settlement Conference.( Settlement Conference reset for 1/18/2017 09:30 AM in Room 3071 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?