The Bank of New York Mellon v. Desert Shores Community Association et al
Plaintiff: The Bank Of New York Mellon
Defendant: Desert Shores Community Association, Nevada Association Services, Inc. and Premier One Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01564
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED THAT the clerk of court close this matter, as all pending claims for relief have been resolved. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Premier's 34 Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted. Premier shall submit a proposed judgment to the court within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 44 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Replies due by 9/15/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Remove Attorney Christine M. Parvan from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that 29 Stipulation for Premier to Amend it Answer to Include Counterclaims against BNYM is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 11 defendant Desert Shores Community Association's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 14 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against defendant Nevada Association Services, Inc. is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon v. Desert Shores Community Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Shores Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier One Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank Of New York Mellon
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Represented By: Allison R. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?