Federal National Mortgage Association v. Flamingo Ridge Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Flamingo Ridge Homeowners Association and Tow Properties, LLC I
Case Number: 2:2016cv01566
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation of Final Judgment Confirming Existence and Validity of Deed of Trust. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order constitutes the final judgment of this court, resolving all claims in this case with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED the parties to file a stipulation of dismissal or a status reporting regarding settlement by 8/14/2020. If a status report is filed, it must provide specific reasons why the HOA cannot sign the documents. The failure to do so will result in dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED the parties to file a stipulation of dismissal or a status reporting regarding settlement by 5/25/2020. The failure to do so will result in dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Motion to Lift Stay of Case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Sean L. Anderson is substituted in place and stead of Elizabeth B Lowell and James W Pengilly for Flamingo Ridge Homeowners Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Mr. Loizzi's Motion to Withdraw. The Clerk of the Court shall serve the bankruptcy trustee with a notice of this order and future filings involving Alessi & Koenig, LLC. The bankruptcy trustee shall have until 8/31/18, to file a status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney David A. Markman terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED until the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number 15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK). Once the mandate issues, any party may move to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Certifying Cases to Nevada Attorney General. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order to the Attorney General for the State of Nevada, via certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: copy of order sent via certified mail to AG in Carson City and Las Vegas, NV - TR)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that 10 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 12 Motion for Order Granting Non-Monetary Status is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. Flamingo Ridge Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Represented By: Steven T. Loizzi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flamingo Ridge Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tow Properties, LLC I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?