Giles v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Tamara F. Giles
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2016cv01604
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff Tamara Giles' attorney, Marc Kalagian, is awarded attorneys' fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406 (b) in the amount of $11,500.00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Marc Kalagian shall reimburse plaintiff Tamara Giles the amount of $3,800.00 for EAJA fees previously paid by the Commissioner. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 12/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 39 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff Tamara Giles' attorney, Marc Kalagian, is awarded attorneys' fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) in the amount of $11,500.00.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Marc Kalagian sha ll reimburse plaintiff Tamara Giles the amount of $3,800.00 for EAJA fees previously paid by the Commissioner. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing set for December 3, 2020 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CLERK'S JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Tamara F. Giles against Andrew Saul. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 1/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 20 Motion to Remand and Denying Commissioner's 25 Cross-Motion to Affirm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Joint Motion to Extend Time (First Request) to File Defendant's Cross-Motion to Affirm. Deadline: 3/9/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 16 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Motion for Remand and/or Reversal. Motion due by 12/1/2106. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the Summons and 7 Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Plaintiff shall serve the Commissioner of the S ocial Security Administration by sending a copy of the Summons and Amended Complaint by certified mail. Following the filing of an Answer, the court will issue a Scheduling Order setting a briefing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Order and Amended Complaint hand delivered to USM - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giles v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: April Angelina Alongi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara F. Giles
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?