McNeal v. Williams et al
Petitioner: Marcus Sharif McNeal
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian E Williams
Case Number: 2:2016cv01618
Filed: July 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 78 Motion to Extend Time to Reply Re: 75 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 3/12/2021. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 72 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 66 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attorney General of the State of Nevada answer due 2/11/2021; Brian E Williams answer due 2/11/2021. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 70 Motion to Extend Time to respond to 66 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents have until 1/11/2021 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 Motion to Extend Time to answer or otherwise respond to the 66 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents have until December 11, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the amended petition for writ of habeas corpus in this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 63 Motion to Extend Time. Petitioner has until 8/31/20, to file an amended petition Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Appointing Counsel and Setting Deadlines. IT IS ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender, through Kimberly Sandberg, Esq., is appointed as counsel for McNeal under 18 U.S.C. § 3006A(a)(2)(B). Amended Petition due by 6/1/2020. See Order further specifications. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 55 Petitioner Marcus Sharif McNeal's Motion for Appointment of Counsel is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 56 , 57 McNeal's Motions to Amend are GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender is provisionally appointed as counsel and will have 30 days to undertake direct representation of McNeal. See Order for further specifications. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Petitioner, Nevada Attorney General, FPD, CJA Coordinator - ADR)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to 10 Notice of Appeal. VACATED AND REMANDED (Case: 2:19-cv-00151-RFB-GWF). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 39 , 44 McNeal's motion for leave to amend and/or supplement his petition is DENIED. Respondents have until 3/12/19, to file an answer to the remaining claims in the petition. McNeal will have 30 days from service of the answer to file any reply. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that McNeal's request to make an untimely election is GRANTED, and his request to dismiss the unexhausted claims from this action is also GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 39 McNeal's motion to amend is construe d as a motion to supplement, and respondents have until 12/21/18, to respond in a single document to 39 , 44 McNeal's requests to supplement his petition. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that respondents have until 12/19/18, to file any supplement to their response to 39 the motion to amend in light of the proposed amended petition. If respondents file a timely supplement, McNeal will have 30 days from the filing of that supplement to file a supplemental reply. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Encl. to P: ECF No. 38 - ADR)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 37 respondents' motion to strike is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to STRIKE 36 McNeal's unauthorized surreply from the docket. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that McNeal's requests for an evidentiary h earing and for a stay and abeyance are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 21 respondents' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Motion deadline: 9/27/18. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 28 petitioner's motion for a Rhines stay and abeyance is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CORRECT 33 the docket to reflect that which has been docketed as a reply to the motion to stay, is in fact a response to 21 the respondents' motion to dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents have until 4/13/18 to file any reply to 33 the petitioner's response to their motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 18 McNeal's motion for appointment ofcounsel is DENIED, and 27 his motion for a time extension is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 25 respondent's motion for leave to file an exhibit under seal is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 8 McNeal's motion for reconsideration is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 16 McNeal's motion to withdraw his motion for production is GRANTED, and 14 McNeal's motion for production is therefore WITHDRAWN. The Clerk of Court is directed to SEND to McNeal a copy of 6 his petition in this case and a copy of his petition in case 2:17-cv-2589-RFB-CWH 1 -1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that McNeal has leave to amend his petition in THIS ACTION. McNeal has until 12/13/17, to file an amended petition. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 motion to extend time to respond to 6 petition for writ of habeas corpus. Response deadline is extended to 30 days after the court enter an order resolving the motion to reconsider 8 . Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 1 McNeal's application to proceed in formapauperis is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 2 McNeal's motion for appointment of counsel and 4 motion for stay are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to FILE and electronically SERVE the petition on respondents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents must respond to the petition by 4/11/17. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus Sharif McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?