Collegium Fund Series 32 v. Snyder et al
Plaintiff: Collegium Fund Series 32
Defendant: Mark Daniel Snyder and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Counter Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC, Collegium Fund Series 32 and Nuevo Vista Homeowners Association, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Federal Home Loan Mortage Corporation and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Intervenor Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortage Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv01640
Filed: July 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the matter of Collegium Fund LLC, Series 32 v. Snyder et al., case number 2:16-cv-01640-JCM-PAL, be and the same hereby is, CLOSED. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 57 Wells Fargo and Freddie Mac's motion for reconsideration be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. The Court's 7/5/2017 56 Order is amended as follows: 26 Freddie Mac's motion for summary judg ment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 58 Collegium's stipulation for an extension of time to respond to Wells Fargo and Freddie Mac's motion for reconsideration be, and the same hereby is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 63 the Stipulation to Stay Discovery is GRANTED to the extent THAT a temporary 60-day stay of discovery until 10/30/2017 is imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting 60 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 57 Motion (First Request). Responses due by 9/1/2017. Replies due by 9/29/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 40 the Stipulated Motion to File Under Seal is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff Collegium Fund shall have until 5/24/2017, to file a redacted version of its Response and exhibits on the public record consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 26 Motion for Summary Judgment (First Request). Replies due by 5/26/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 41 Stipulation to Extend Time (Third Request) to Respond to 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 4/18/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation to Extend Time (Second Request) to Respond to 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 3/28/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) to Respond to 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 3/7/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 28 First Stipulated Protective Order Governing Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall meet and/or confer as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) not later than September 28, 2016. Discovery due by 1/9/2017. Motions due by 2/8/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 09/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collegium Fund Series 32 v. Snyder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC
Represented By: Shane D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Collegium Fund Series 32
Represented By: Paul R Connaghan
Represented By: Tara D Newberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Nuevo Vista Homeowners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth B Lowell
Represented By: David A Markman
Represented By: James W Pengilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collegium Fund Series 32
Represented By: Paul R Connaghan
Represented By: Tara D Newberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Federal Home Loan Mortage Corporation
Represented By: Nathan Guy Kanute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Craig S Denney
Represented By: Nathan Guy Kanute
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortage Corporation
Represented By: Nathan Guy Kanute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Daniel Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Craig S Denney
Represented By: Nathan Guy Kanute
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?