Konecne et al v. Allied Van Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Meghan Konecne and Howard Misle
Defendant: Allied Van Lines, Inc. and Berger Transfer and Storage, Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv01655
Filed: July 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Granting 97 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 93 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 71 Motion (Third Request). Responses due by 2/6/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting 92 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 88 Order (Fourth Request). Motions due by 2/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting 89 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 68 Objection Magistrate Judge Order (Fourth Request). Responses due by 1/23/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting 85 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 79 Order (Third Request). Motions due by 1/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting 83 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 68 Objection Magistrate Judge Order (Third Request). Responses due by 1/10/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting 80 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 71 Motion for Relief. Responses due by 1/9/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 78 Stipulation; Motions due by 1/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting 76 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 68 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1 (Second Request). Responses due by 1/3/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 74 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 67 Order (First Request). Motions due by 12/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting 70 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 68 Objection (First Request). Responses due by 12/20/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 64 Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Reopen Discovery is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the dispositive motion deadline is 12/11/2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the joint pretrial order deadline is 1/10/2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 50 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 10 the defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. If the plaintiffs wish to pursue recovery for the alleged damage to their staircase under the Carmack Amendment, they must file a second amended complaint within 21 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Defendants 5 Motion to Dismiss, which was directed at the original complaint, is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 09/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Konecne et al v. Allied Van Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Kristol Bradley Ginapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berger Transfer and Storage, Inc
Represented By: Kristol Bradley Ginapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Konecne
Represented By: Eric Dobberstein
Represented By: Rhonda Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Misle
Represented By: Eric Dobberstein
Represented By: Rhonda Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?