JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC, Mountains Edge Master Association, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Via Valencia
Case Number: 2:2016cv01677
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that the $500 in 16 security costs posted by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., on 11/9/2016 shall be discharged and released to the Ballard Spahr LLP Trust Account. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - SLD)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 44 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 41 Motion to Extend Time re Discovery. Discovery due by 7/3/2017., Motions due by 8/3/2017., Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/4/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 21 Motion to certify. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Mountains Edge Master Association. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. plaintiff shall post security in the amount of $500.00 within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/2/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Finance - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountains Edge Master Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Via Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Justin A Shiroff
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?