Bank of America N.A. v. Operture Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America N.A.
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig LLC, Bridger Investment LLC, Indigo Homeowners' Association, George Peter Lee and Operture Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01692
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Dismissing with prejudice Defendant Operture, Inc. for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/27/2019., Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER dismissing defendants without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/14/2019., Alessi & Koenig LLC and Bridger Investment LLC terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 86 Stipulation of Dismissal as to George Peter Lee and Indigo Homeowner's Association; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting in part Defendant Indigo Homeowners Association's 31 Motion to Dismiss. Bank of America shall file an amended complaint if it seeks to cure the deficiencies identified in this order by 7/17/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Stipulation to file Amended Complaint; Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 Stipulation; Discovery due by 10/31/2018. Motions due by 11/30/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 56 Stipulation; Vacating as to George Peter Lee 46 Judgment, Setting Aside 36 Clerk's Entry of Default. George Peter Lee answer due 21 days from entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that the remaining parties to this case shall meet and confer and shall file a joint status report on or before May 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 52 Stipulation for Limited Stay as to Claims Asserted Against Indigo Homeowners' Association; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that the remaining parties to this case shall meet and confer and shall file a joint status report on or before March 16, 2018 addressing these issues. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting ECF No. 29 Motion to Lift Stay, lifting case stay for all purposes. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 27 Motion to Lift Stay. Case Stayed. Once proceedings in the U.S. Supreme Court have concluded, any party may move to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STAYING CASE pending issuance of Mandate from Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Directing Parties to Certify Cases to Nevada Attorney General. Proof of compliance due within 10 days. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America N.A. v. Operture Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridger Investment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indigo Homeowners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Peter Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Operture Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Aaron D Lancaster
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?