U.S.A. Dawgs, Inc. et al v. Crocs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Double Diamond Distribution, Ltd. and U.S.A. Dawgs, Inc.
Defendant: Crocs, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01694
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Judgment is entered in the amount of $12,219.01 in attorneys' fees in favor of Crocs, Inc., to be paid jointly and severally by U.S.A. Dawgs, Inc. and Double Diamond Distribution, Ltd. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re Defendant Crocs, Inc.'s 59 Renewed Motion for Sanctions. Crocs shall file a supplemental brief within 14 days from the date of this order discussing the Rule 54-14(b) factors. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that this action is STAYED pending termination of Plaintiff's bankruptcy proceeding. Plaintiff shall notify the court of the termination of its bankruptcy proceeding within 14 days following termination thereof. Defendant's 42 Motion for Leave to supplement its Motion for Sanctions is Denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's 43 Motion for Reconsideration is Denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's 52 Motion for Leave to Supplement is Denied. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying Defendant Crocs, Inc.'s 29 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Motion for Leave to Extend Time to File a Response re 29 Motion for Sanctions. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall have one day from the date of this order to file their response to defendant's motion. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S.A. Dawgs, Inc. et al v. Crocs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crocs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Double Diamond Distribution, Ltd.
Represented By: Brian John Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S.A. Dawgs, Inc.
Represented By: Brian John Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?