Rice v. Clark County School District
Plaintiff: Leslie Rice
Defendant: Clark County School District
Case Number: 2:2016cv01709
Filed: July 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting Defendant's 72 Motion to Stay Case pending filing of a stipulation of dismissal. The parties will inform the court should a stipulation of dismissal not be filed within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting 70 Stipulation to Extend Time. Settlement documents are due by 6/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 68 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 65 Amended Complaint. Clark County School District's answer due 6/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 66 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 65 Amended Complaint. Clark County School District's answer due 5/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 32 Motion to Amend Complaint. CCSD's 49 Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 57 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Responses due by 7/14/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 32 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff's Replies due by 6/28/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that 34 Motion to Re-Open Limited Discovery is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 32 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Defendant's Responses due by 6/14/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 41 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 34 MOTION Re-Open Limited Discovery. Defendant's Responses due by 6/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) Modified to link to proper docket entry on 6/2/2017 (SLD).
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 7 CCSD's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Withdraw Attorneys Dan M. Winder, Scott Dorman, Kristina Miletovic and Arnold Weinstock as counsel for Leslie Rice. Plaintiff shall have until 1/17/2017 to retain substitute counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Clark County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County School District
Represented By: S. Scott Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Rice
Represented By: Scott Dorman
Represented By: Arnold Weinstock
Represented By: Dan M. Winder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?