Beta Soft Systems, Inc. v. The Yosemite Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Beta Soft Systems, Inc.
Defendant: The Yosemite Group, LLC, Angela Williams and Terrance Williams
Case Number: 2:2016cv01748
Filed: July 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 53 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically for 10/11/2017 Hearing. The call-in telephone number is (888)273-3658, access code: 3912597. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on 48 the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants the Yosemite Group, LLC, Terrance Williams, and Angela Williams is scheduled for 1:00 PM, 10/11/17, in Courtroom 3D. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Terrance Williams and Angela Williams must be present at the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 35 the Motion to Appear Telephonically for Hearing is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on 33 the Amended Stipulation and Order to Extend Case Deadlines is scheduled for 1:30 PM, 5/24/17, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that a hearing on the Stipulation and Order to Extend Case Deadlines (ECF NO. 28 ) is scheduled for 11:00 AM, April 10, 2017, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation to File Surreply re 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beta Soft Systems, Inc. v. The Yosemite Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beta Soft Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon
Represented By: Ravdeep S. Grewal
Represented By: Paul S. Padda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Yosemite Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?