Lopez et al v. U.S. Home Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Patrease Ashley, Matthew Bachman, Lillie A Banks, Derek Bao, Robyn Cooper, Jennifer Durham, Paula Earl-McConico, Pablo Echevarria, Steve Feldman, Martin Freeman, Veronica Freeman, Jennifer Houghland, Nicole Jenkins, Timmy Le, Soon Lewis, Anthony Lopez, Brittany Lopez, Kristal Mackert, Seth Mackert, Willie McConico, Shelby McEvoy, Paul E Melendez, Kenneth Pfeifer, Gerda Pierrot, Kylee Reeder, Nathan Reeder, Jerome A Reyes, Nicole Shinavar, Nicholas Speldrich, Timothy Thompson, Nguyen Trinh, Maryann Undis, Holly Wortley, Scott Wortley, Linda Yarbrough, Shawn Ybarra, Ping Yue and Shuren Zhang
Defendant: Greystone Nevada, LLC and U.S. Home Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv01754
Filed: July 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER Re: 621 Stipulation/Joint Motion to Dismiss. This Stipulation should be treated as a Joint Motion under LR 7-1(c). Third-Party Defendant Sierra Air Conditioning, Inc. is Dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDER granting 623 Motion to Dismiss Houston-Stafford Electric, Inc. with prejudice; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER Granting Third Party Defendant Eagle Plastering, Inc.'s 385 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement in the amount of $41,000.00. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER Granting Third Party Defendant Larry Methvin Installations, Inc.'s 446 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement in the amount of $4,000.00. Third Party Defendant Larry Methvin Installations, Inc. is Dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/31/2018., (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER Granting Third Party Defendant Cooper Roofing Company, Inc.'s 413 Motion for Good Faith Settlement in the amount of $6,000.00. Third Party Defendant Cooper Roofing Company, Inc is Dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER Granting Third-Party Defendant Custom Hearth Distributors, Inc.'s 359 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement in the amount of $300.00. The Complaint, Third-Party Complaint, and all amendments thereto against Custom Hearth Distributors, Inc. is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER Granting Third Party Defendant Infinity Building Products, LLC's 488 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement in the amount of $500.00. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER Granting Third Party Defendant Kennington Plastering, Nevada's 409 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement in the amount of $10,000.00. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER Granting Third Party Defendant General Electric Company's 315 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement in the amount of $250.00. Upon payment of the settlement monies Third-Party Defendant General Electric Company shall be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER Granting 515 Stipulation for Substitution of Attorneys. Attorney Kenneth E Goates terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER Granting 478 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice Third-Party Defendant Hutchins Drywall, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER granting 460 Stipulation of Third Party Defendant dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/18/2017.; Circle S Development Corporation terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER Granting 447 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Third-Party Dwefendant Masco Cabinetry, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER Granting 411 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Third-Party Defendant Republic Electric, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER Granting 355 Motion to Amend 256 Scheduling Order (Second Request). Discovery due by 3/22/2018. Motions due by 4/20/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Granting 81 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and 41(c)(1), the Court DISMISSES Third-Party Defendant True Team Partner, LLC dba Gale Building Products. The Court not es, however, that pursuant to these Rules, a court order is not required to file "a notice of dismissal before the opposing party serves either an answer or a motion for summary judgment." Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Greystone Nevada, LLC and U.S. Home Corporation's 46 Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Defendant Pacific Electric, Inc. fka Johnson Electric, Inc. without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 31 Motion to Remove Attorney James V. Lavelle III from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 02/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Remand to State Court. Defendants' 5 Motion to Dismiss is Granted in part and Denied in part. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 7 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiffs to file a response to Defendants'Motion to Dismiss is extended to 9/2/16. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties' deadli ne to file a joint status report is extended to 9/8/16. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties' request to extend the deadline to file a motion to remand is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez et al v. U.S. Home Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrease Ashley
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bachman
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie A Banks
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Bao
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Cooper
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Durham
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Earl-McConico
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Echevarria
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Feldman
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Freeman
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Freeman
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Houghland
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Jenkins
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timmy Le
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soon Lewis
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Lopez
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Lopez
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristal Mackert
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Mackert
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie McConico
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby McEvoy
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul E Melendez
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Pfeifer
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerda Pierrot
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kylee Reeder
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Reeder
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome A Reyes
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Shinavar
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Speldrich
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Thompson
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nguyen Trinh
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Undis
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Wortley
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Wortley
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Yarbrough
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Ybarra
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ping Yue
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shuren Zhang
Represented By: Laurel L. Barry
Represented By: Jonathan G Lattie
Represented By: James V. Lavelle III
Represented By: Teresa A Libertino
Represented By: David T. Pursiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystone Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Gregory H. King
Represented By: Sarah J. Odia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Home Corporation
Represented By: Gregory H. King
Represented By: Sarah J. Odia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?