US Bank National Associationv. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: US Bank National Association
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Terraces at Rose Lake Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv01776
Filed: July 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Lifting Stay. Within 60 days of the date of this order, the parties shall meet and confer. Within ten days after the meet-and-confer, the parties shall file a proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/2/2019., Case stay lifted. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED until the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number 15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK). Once the mandate issues, any party may move to lift the stay. Regardless of this stay, the plaintiff shall timely serve process upon the defendants and file proof of service. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Parties to Certify Cases to Nevada Attorney General. Proof of compliance due within 10 days. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Bank National Associationv. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terraces at Rose Lake Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Wayne O. Klomp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?