Raveling v. Nevada Heart and Vascular Center, LLP
Plaintiff: Gayle Raveling
Defendant: Nevada Heart and Vascular Center, LLP
Case Number: 2:2016cv01779
Filed: July 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the Early Neutral Evaluation is continued to 12/21/2016 before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Plaintiff shall arrive in Judge Hoffman's Chambers, Room 3014 at 1:00 p.m. and Defendant shall arrive at 1:30 p.m. Confidential ENE statements are due to Judge Hoffman's Chambers no later than 4:00 p.m., 12/14/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying without prejudice as moot Defendant's 11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raveling v. Nevada Heart and Vascular Center, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Heart and Vascular Center, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Raveling
Represented By: Ruth L. Cohen
Represented By: Paul S. Padda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?