DCR Mortgage 1, LLC v. Gary L. Sylver
Plaintiff: DCR Mortgage 1, LLC
Defendant: Gary L. Sylver
Case Number: 2:2016cv01787
Filed: July 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Vacating 57 Order on Stipulation of Dismissal. Case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 55 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice; Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Status Report due by 5/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER that parties shall file a further joint status report on March 15, 2018, and every 60 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that no later than January 18, 2018, the parties shall file either dismissal papers or a further joint status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2018, and every 90 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that the settlement conference set for 9/19/2017 is Vacated. No later than 9/26/2017 the parties shall file a joint statement as to whether this case has been stayed and, if so, the current duration of that stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that the Court VACATES the August 15, 2017, settlement conference and ORDERS Defendants counsel to comply in full with LR IA 11-1(b), no later than August 30, 2017. The Court further ORDERS the parties to meet and confer regarding a new date for the settlement conference. No later than August 21, 2017, the parties shall file a stipulation with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re 35 Order Scheduling Settlement Conference. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Sylver is required to be present at the settlement conference on 8/15/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 24 Status Report filed by DCR Mortgage 1, LLC. The Court hereby ORDERS counsel to review Local Rule 26-3 (as amended, 5/1/16) and to file an amended joint status report that complies with the Local Rules by 12/27/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Status Report filed by DCR Mortgage 1, LLC Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying 17 Case Management Report. Request to Stay or Amend Discovery Plan due by 10/24/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Defendant has failed to file a certificate of interested parties. Accordingly, Defendant must file a certificate of interested parties no later than 9/21/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DCR Mortgage 1, LLC v. Gary L. Sylver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DCR Mortgage 1, LLC
Represented By: Justin James Bustos
Represented By: John Patrick Desmond
Represented By: Edward D. Vaisbort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary L. Sylver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?