White v. Stroud et al
Plaintiff: Lee A White
Defendant: S Barrett, Palalay, Bruce Stroud, Vasquez and Culinary Wilson
Case Number: 2:2016cv01789
Filed: July 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is referred to the Pro Bono Program for appointment of counsel for the purposes identified herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Pro Bono Liaison - ADR)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Jury Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 4 Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Nevada Department of Corrections shall pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court, District of Nevada, 20& #037; of the preceding month's deposits to Plaintiff's account (Lee A. White, #1092649), in the months that the account exceeds $10.00, until the full $350.00 filing fee has been paid for this action. See Order for further deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance, Chief of Inmate Services-NDOC, Adam Laxalt - ADR)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that within 30 days from the date of this Order Plaintiff shall either file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full $400 fee for filing a civil action. If Plaintiff does not timely comply with this Order dis missal of this action may result. The Clerk of the Court shall retain the 1 -1 Complaint but not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - mailed IFP form/instructions to Plaintiff - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Stroud et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palalay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Culinary Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee A White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?