LHF Productions, Inc. v. Does
Plaintiff: LHF Productions, Inc.
Defendant: John Does
Case Number: 2:2016cv01804
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DEFAULT JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Plaintiff LHF Productions, Inc. and against Defendant Philina Buenafe. Plaintiff is awarded $1,500 in statutory damages and $6,480 in reasonable attorney's fees and costs for a total of $7,980. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 10/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 29 Order to Show Cause. Given the proceduralposture of this case the Court finds a response to the order to show cause to be unnecessary and it is Discharged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that 26 Motion to Extend Deadline to Effectuate Service is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LHF Productions, Inc. v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LHF Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?