Tolliver v. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: |
George A Tolliver |
Defendant: |
Karly McCormack, Nevada Department of Corrections, James Ozurenda and Gustavo Sanchez |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv01807 |
Filed: |
July 28, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy J. Koppe |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 18, 2017 |
Filing
22
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
August 4, 2017 |
Filing
21
ORDER that 7 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a non-prisoner, as well as t he document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than September 5, 2017, Plaintiff shall either file a completed ifp application or pay the full filing fee. FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not timely comply with this order, dismissal of this action may result. FURTHER ORDERED that upon the resolution of the matter of the filing fee this Court shall issue a subsequent order on the matter of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 11, 2017 |
Filing
18
ORDER Amending 17 Order Scheduling Inmate Early Mediation Conference. An Inmate Early Mediation Conference is set for 7/28/2017 at 11:15 AM in Room 3054. J. Michael McGroarty, ESQ. has been appointed as the mediator in this case. The inmate early mediation is continued in time only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
May 31, 2017 |
Filing
15
ORDER granting 14 Motion to Extend Time. Limited Notice of Appearance due 6/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
August 30, 2016 |
Filing
6
ORDER Granting 4 Motion to Extend Time. No later than 9/30/2016, Plaintiff shall either pay filing fee in full or file a complete IFP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?