February 1, 2022 |
Filing
125
ORDER Granting 124 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
October 3, 2019 |
Filing
118
ORDER TO RELEASE BOND. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
October 2, 2019 |
Filing
117
ORDER Granting 116 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 109 Motion for Attorney Fees. Therefore, the parties agree to extend Sommerset's deadline to file a Reply to and including 10/8/2019. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
September 12, 2019 |
Filing
111
ORDER Granting 110 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
August 27, 2019 |
Filing
108
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of SFR and against Borrowers, HFRC, and Allied as to SFR's quiet title/declaratory relief claims. Re: 107 Order on Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 8/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
August 26, 2019 |
Filing
107
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 100 , 102 , 103 SFR's Motions for Default Judgment, are GRANTED. Default Judgment is GRANTED in favor of SFR and against Borrowers, HFRC, and Allied as to SFR's quiet title/declaratory relief claims. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
July 10, 2019 |
Filing
98
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 85 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, is GRANTED consistent with the foregoing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 84 , 86 Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment, are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 62 HOA's Motion to Dismiss, and 73 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike, are DENIED as MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the event SFR seeks default judgment against Borrowers, HFRC, and Allied, SFR shall file a motion for default judgment within twenty-eight (28) days of this Order's issuance. Otherwise, SFR shall file a status report within this deadline apprising the Court as to how it intends to proceed against Borrowers, HFRC, and Allied. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
April 9, 2019 |
Filing
97
ORDER granting 64 Motion to Substitute Party. FURTHER ORDERED that The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWABS, Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-2 is substituted for Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing LLC as the plaintiff in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
October 17, 2018 |
Filing
75
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 74 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 21, 2018 |
Filing
58
ORDER granting 57 Stipulation to Lift Stay. FURTHER ORDERED that 56 Motion to Lift Stay is DENIED as moot. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 29, 2017 |
Filing
50
ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to the Clerk of Court for random reassignment to another Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 24, 2017 |
Filing
49
ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED pending exhaustion of all appeals of Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, 832 F.3d 1154 (9th Cir. 2016). Once exhaustion occurs, any party may move to lift the stay. Until that time, all proceedings in this action are stayed. FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED without prejudice with leave to refile within twenty-one days after the stay is lifted.FURTHER ORDERED that current occupant SFR Investments Pool 1 , LLC shall care for, preserve, and maintain the Property.FURTHER ORDERED that, beginning on August 24, 2017, the parties must file a joint status report updating the Court on the status of this case every one-hundred and eighty days. Along with t he joint status report, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC shall submit a statement affirming that all expenses necessary to maintain the property, including but not limited to, timely and full payment of all homeowners association assessments, property ta xes, and property insurance premiums due and owing or past due at any time during the effective period of this Stay are current and up to date.FURTHER ORDERED that this Order does not prevent the parties from continuing to engage in settlement conference negotiations with the assistance of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
October 31, 2016 |
Filing
22
ORDER that 11 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must submit a bond pursuant to this Order in the amount of $500.00 as to Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|