Nationwide Life Insurance Company v. Martinez et al
Plaintiff: Nationwide Life Insurance Company
Defendant: American Funeral Financial, LLC, Diane Colley, Megan Colley, Melissa Colley, Michelle Colley and Lynn Martinez
Case Number: 2:2016cv01845
Filed: August 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting 69 Amended Stipulation to Disburse Funds. This order vacates and replaces 66 the prior order. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - MR)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 65 Stipulation of Dismissal. IT IS SO ORDERED this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, each side to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to vacate all hearings and deadlines and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 56 Stipulation. Motion hearing re 40 Motion to Dismiss and 46 Motion to Amend reset for 10/30/2017 at 03:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 52 Stipulation. Motion Hearing re 40 Motion to Dismiss and 46 Motion to Amend reset for 9/25/2017 at 02:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 41 Stipulation to conduct Settlement Conference. This case is referred to a magistrate judge for a Mandatory Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re 36 Stipulation re Dismissal. IT IS SO ORDERED. All claims in this action by and against Nationwide Life Insurance Company and American Funeral Financial, LLC are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Colley defendants have until 6/12/17 to file an amended answer and crossclaim against Martinez. Failure to file a crossclaim by that date will result in the dismissal of this entire case for lack of a pending claim. Once the crossclaim has been filed, the remaining parties may move for a referral to a magistrate judge for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying 21 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/10/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 1 Complaint. Plaintiff must file a certificate of interested parties no later than August 16,2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Life Insurance Company v. Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Funeral Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Colley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Colley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Colley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Colley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Life Insurance Company
Represented By: John L. Viola
Represented By: W. Chris Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?