Ditech Financial, LLC v. SFR Investment Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ditech Financial, LLC
Defendant: Montenegro Estates, Nevada Association Services, Inc. and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01880
Filed: August 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 67 Stipulation of Dismissal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against Montenegro Estates are DISMISSED with prejudice, each side to bear its own fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all remaining parties mu st file a stipulated dismissal of all remaining claims or a joint status report explaining when such a dismissal will be filed by 8/31/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 62 Stipulation to Stay. The parties must file a stipulated dismissal or status update by 5/6/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 59 Stipulation to Substitute Real Party in Interest. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (Second Request). Montenegro Estates answer due 8/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation fo Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Montenegro Estates answer due 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 44 the motion to lift stay is GRANTED IN PART in that THE STAY IS LIFTED but some of the other details and deadlines requested by the motion are denied or revised. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case is STAYED. Once the United States Supreme Court proceedings in Bourne Valley and Saticoy Bay have concluded, any party may move to lift this stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pending 14 and 15 motions to dismiss are Denied without prejudice to their refiling within 20 days of the order lifting the stay. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 03/01/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 17 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff has until 1/22/17, to present to the Clerk of Court $500.00 in lawful money as security in compliance with NRS 18.130(1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the CLERK OF COURT is directed to accept the deposit of $500.00 from plaintiff under NRS 18.130 as security for costs and charges that may be awarded against this plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ditech Financial, LLC v. SFR Investment Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ditech Financial, LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Represented By: Alex Fugazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montenegro Estates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?