Johnson v. Garofalo et al
Plaintiff: Lausteveion Johnson
Defendant: Connie Bisbee, Board of Parole Commissioner, James Dzurenda, Darla Foley, Garofalo, Michael Keeler, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Lucille Monterde, NDOC, Brian Sandoval, State of Nevada, Brian Williams and Yates
Case Number: 2:2016cv01889
Filed: August 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER Granting 193 Motion in Limine and Granting in part and Denying in part 200 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER TO TRANSPORT PLAINTIFF LAUSTEVEION JOHNSON, inmate # 82138, for Calendar call and Trial. The Clerk is directed to supply a copy of this order to the U.S. Marshal's Office. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; cc: USMS - DRS)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER for Issuance of Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum for Lausteveion Johnson for Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Gloria M. Navarro Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF and emailed to USMS - DRS)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER denying 189 Motion to Conduct Limited Discover. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER rejecting 185 Joint Pretrial Order as deficient. A Proposed Joint Pretrial Order in accordance with LR 16-4 is due by 4/24/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER denying 104 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; ORDER granting 114 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 121 Motion for Default Judgment; ORDER denying 130 Motion for Hearing; ORDER granting in part and denying in part [1 35] Motion for Summary Judgment (see order for details); ORDER denying 144 Motion to Strike; ORDER denying 148 Motion to Strike; ORDER denying 150 Motion; ORDER denying 181 Motion. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due 30 days from date of this order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Re: NDOC Defendants' 174 Motion for Clarification and 175 Status Report. The settlement conference will go forward at 10:00 AM on 1/17/2020. The Attorney General's Office will arrange for the transportation of Plaintiff to and from the settlement conference. (see Order for details re: attendance). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 162 Motion for Limited Appearance for Settlement Conference. Any opposition to the 163 Motion to Excuse Personal Appearance of Defendants is due by 12/11/2019. Plaintiff may file a supplemental response to the 163 Motion by 12/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Granting the Parole Board Defendants' 157 Motion to Continue Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference is rescheduled for 1/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The Attorney General's Office will arrange for the transportation of Plaintiff to and from the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER that the Attorney General's Office will arrange for the transportation of Plaintiff Johnson to and from the settlement conference set for 11/22/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER that Plaintiff's 106 Motion to Compel Discovery, 107 Motion for Settlement Conference, and 108 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline are Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Plaintiff's 93 Motion to Alter or Amend Order. Plaintiff's 87 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is Denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's 92 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is Denied and the Parole Board Defendants' 97 Motion to Strike is Denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER that the Status Hearing set for 12/11/2018 at 11:00 AM is VACATED. The following Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order apply: Discovery due by 6/5/2019. Motions due by 7/5/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting the Parole Board Defendants' 47 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims asserted against Parole Board Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiffs claims against the NDOC Defendants remain. Plaintiff's 58 C ounter Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. The Parole Board Defendants' 60 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Plaintiff's 66 Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Order is DENIED. Plaintiff's 68 and 74 Motions for Preliminary Injunction are DENIED. Plaintiff's 78 Motion for Oral Argument is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER that the 47 Motion to Dismiss is still pending. The Status Hearing is rescheduled for 12/11/2018 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Discovery is stayed until 12/11/2018. FURTHER ORDERED that defense counsel arrange for transportation of Plaintiff Johnson to and from the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting Defendants' 46 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Presentence Investigation Report Under Seal. Plaintiff's 44 Motion to Conduct Discovery is Denied. Defendants' 52 Motion to Stay Discovery is Granted. Status Hearing set for 6/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that Plaintiff has paid $350 towards the filing fee. A civil filing fee in federal court is $350 filing fee plus $50 administrative fee. The $50 administrative fee is waived. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Defendants' 23 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff has until 10/27/2017 to pay the complete filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Garofalo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Bisbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Parole Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darla Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garofalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Keeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucille Monterde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lausteveion Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?