The Bank Of New York Mellon v. Tramonto Villaggio Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: The Bank Of New York Mellon
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Daisy Trust and Tramonto Villaggio Homeowners Association
Unknown: Christine M. Parvan
Case Number: 2:2016cv01897
Filed: August 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 71 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Tramonto Villaggio Homeowners Association; Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion to Lift Stay of Case; Stipulations, motions to modify the discovery plan and scheduling order, or in the absence of such stipulations or motions, dispositive motions are due within forty-five (45) days after the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/19/2018.; Case stay lifted. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; This Action is Stayed. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank Of New York Mellon v. Tramonto Villaggio Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daisy Trust
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tramonto Villaggio Homeowners Association
Represented By: Christopher B. Anthony
Represented By: Edward D Boyack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank Of New York Mellon
Represented By: Rex Garner
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Christine M. Parvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?