Bilderback v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Dianne Bilderback
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01954
Filed: August 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting Defendant's 24 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's 30 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority is Denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in Ocwen's favor and close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 35 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting nunc pro tunc to 1/23/2017 Plaintiff's 25 Motion to Extend Time re 24 Second Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's 27 Response is deemed timely. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation re Limited Stay of Discovery. All discovery is stayed until the earlier of 20 days after Defendant files an answer or 6/20/2017. After 6/6/2017 the parties may file a stipulation to further stay discovery and the filing of a new Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation to Extend Time re 9 MOTION to Dismiss re 1 Complaint. ( Responses due by 12/16/2016.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Stipulation to Extend Time (Second Request) to Respond to Defendant's 9 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/9/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) to Respond to 9 MOTION to Dismiss re 1 Complaint. Responses due by 11/9/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bilderback v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Bilderback
Represented By: Mitchell D Gliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Beckom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?