Nationstar Mortgage, LLC v. San Rafael Townhomes, Phase I Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Defendant: Rancho San Rafael Townhomes, Phase I Homeowners Association and Thunder Properties, Inc.
ThirdParty Defendant: Hampton & Hampton Collections, LLC
ThirdParty Plaintiff: Rancho San Rafael Townhomes, Phase I Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv01961
Filed: August 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Exception to Party Attendance Requirement. The HOA Board member shall participate by telephone for the duration of the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Motion to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline. Motions due by 5/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC v. San Rafael Townhomes, Phase I Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Hampton & Hampton Collections, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Rancho San Rafael Townhomes, Phase I Homeowners Association
Represented By: Edward D Boyack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rancho San Rafael Townhomes, Phase I Homeowners Association
Represented By: Edward D Boyack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunder Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Rhoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?