Bank Of New York Mellon v. Meister Park Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank Of New York Mellon
Defendant: Meister Park Homeowners Association, Nevada Association Services, Inc. and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01969
Filed: August 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Denying 176 Stipulation to appear by telephone. See order for additional instruction and detail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER Granting 172 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. If the settlement conference is unsuccessful, BoNYM and Meister Park Homeowners Association will show cause why the stay should continue or submit a new scheduling order to complete any rem aining discovery within 14 days from the competition of the conference. SFR's response to the pending 167 Motion for Reconsideration should not be due until 9/22/2021, which is 30 days after the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting SFR's 120 Motion for Summary Judgment. Further Ordered HOA's 117 Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted in part and Denied in Part with BNYM given leave to Amend Complaint within 21 days. BNYM's ; [12 4] Motion to Dismiss and 125 Motion for Summary Judgment are Denied and SFR's 138 Counter- Motion to Strike is Granted in part and Denied in part. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Main Document 154 replaced on 3/3/2021) (DRS).
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting 140 Stipulation and for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re 132 Response to 125 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 5/11/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 135 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME 127 Response and 125 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response and Reply due by 4/24/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 133 Stipulation for Extension of Time. SFR may extend the deadline one day to file its response to BNY Mellons motion for summary judgment 125 and its reply to BNY Mellons response 127 to SFRs motion for summary judgment 120 . Responses due by 4/21/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Granting 119 Motion to Extend Time re 112 Order (First Request). Motions due by 3/30/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 AMENDED ORDER that the parties shall have 30 days from the date of remand to file renewed dispositive motions. The Court's prior 102 Order is now amended to conform with this Order. The Clerk of Court shall reopen the case and deliver a copy of this Order to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Appeal Number 18-15932. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; cc: USCA - SLD)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 68 Motion for Summary Judgment. SFR's 71 Counter Motion to Stay and 72 Counter Motion for Relief under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d) are Denied. The HOA's 80 Motion for Summary Judgm ent is Denied. Plaintiff's 81 Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied as moot. SFR's 83 Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied. Plaintiff's remaining claims are Dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is ordered to close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED pending exhaustion of all appeals of Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, No. 15-15233 (9th Cir. Aug. 12, 2016). All pending motions are DENIED without prejudice with leave to refile within 21 days after the stay is lifted. Beginning on 10/10/2017 the parties must file a joint status report updating the Court on the status of this case every 180 days. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's 48 Motion for Service by Publication as to Soraya Barnes. Service must be effectuated on or before 5/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying without prejudice the 46 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that the parties file a Stipulated Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 11/14/2016 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank Of New York Mellon v. Meister Park Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank Of New York Mellon
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meister Park Homeowners Association
Represented By: Timothy C. Pittsenbarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Represented By: Howard C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?