Bank Of New York Mellon v. Royal Highlands Street and Landscape Maintenance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Bank Of New York Mellon
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig LLC, Royal Highlands Street and Landscape Maintenance Corporation and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01993
Filed: August 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 82 SFR's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 83 BNYM's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that 85 Royal Highlands' motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Stipulation to Clarify Renewed Summary Judgment Briefing Deadlines. Motions due by 12/20/2018. Responses due by 1/10/2019. Replies due by 1/24/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 64 plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon's second motion for leave to file its first amended complaint be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file, within seven (7) days from the entry of this order, a first amended complaint identical to that attached to their motion to amend 64 -1. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting 62 Stipulation Withdrawing 57 , 58 Motions for Summary Judgment. Motions due by 12/20/2018. Responses due by 1/10/2019. Replies due by 1/24/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 53 plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint be, and the same hereby is, DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 60 plaintiff's motion for leave to file supplemental brief be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 8 RHS's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if BNYM wishes to request leave to file an amended complaint, it must do so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 47 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 35 Stipulation to Temporarily Stay Case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 10:00 a.m., 7/10/17, in courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Motion to Certify a Question of Law to Nevada's Supreme Court is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 10 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon shall post a cost bond in the amount of $500.00 or make a cash deposit of $500.00 as to SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - ADR)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation for Cost Bond. BoNY shall post a cost bond or cash deposit of $500.00 within fourteen days of the Court's approval of this stipulation. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank Of New York Mellon v. Royal Highlands Street and Landscape Maintenance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Highlands Street and Landscape Maintenance Corporation
Represented By: Ryan D Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Represented By: Howard C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank Of New York Mellon
Represented By: Rex Garner
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?