Hurd et al v. Clark County School District et al
Plaintiff: Olivia N. Espinoza, Brook M. Hurd, Geraldine C. Hurd and Luis O. Villalobos
Defendant: Clark County School District, James P. Doran, Kristy Keller and Shawn Paquette
Case Number: 2:2016cv02011
Filed: August 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER Granting 211 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 12/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, for good cause shown, that 186 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 196 Defendants' Motion to File Sur-Reply, is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting 181 Stipulation re: 178 Motion for Attorney Fees. Responses due by 4/19/2019. Replies due by 4/26/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER that 139 and 147 Motions to Seal are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting 169 Stipulation. The deadline for Plaintiffs to File a Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs is extended two weeks to March 29, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 133 CCSD's Motion to Maintain Confidentiality Designations and Seal Documents Previously Filed and 135 , 136 Motions to Seal are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting 163 Stipulation. The deadline for dismissal is extended to 30 days after the approval of either the petition for minors' compromises or the application for fees and costs, whichever is later. A Status Check is scheduled for 2/19/2019 at 01:45 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting 149 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 137 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Replies due by 8/31/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 119 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond/Reply re: 117 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 5/25/2018. Replies due by 6/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting 118 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to defendant Kristy Keller. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting 114 Third Stipulation to Modify the Scheduling Order. Motions due by 7/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 109 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order. Motions due by 6/22/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that 59 Motion To Excuse the Personal Attendance of Shawn Paquette and Kristy Keller at the November 3, 2017 Settlement Conference is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER that 20 , 30 Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that 37 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have twenty-one days from the filing of th is Order to file an amended complaint. Failure to file an amended complaint by this date shall result in the Court dismissing the section 1983 claim with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re 59 Motion to Excuse. Responses due by 9/26/2017., Replies due by 9/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that a Telephonic Hearing re 46 Stipulation to Extend Certain Deadlines is set for 7/21/2017 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 42 Motion to Appoint Plaintiff Olivia N. Espinoza as Guardian ad Litem for minor Plaintiff L.M.V.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order ishereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order to the extent that it is consistent with this Order. Discovery due by 11/1/2017. Motions due by 12/1/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 01/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file, no later than January 27, 2017, either (1) a joint proposed discovery plan; or (2) a status report explaining why a proposed discovery plan should not be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 01/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurd et al v. Clark County School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Paquette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia N. Espinoza
Represented By: Peter Alfert
Represented By: Todd A. Boley
Represented By: Marianne C. Lanuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brook M. Hurd
Represented By: Peter Alfert
Represented By: Todd A. Boley
Represented By: Marianne C. Lanuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine C. Hurd
Represented By: Peter Alfert
Represented By: Todd A. Boley
Represented By: Marianne C. Lanuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis O. Villalobos
Represented By: Peter Alfert
Represented By: Todd A. Boley
Represented By: Marianne C. Lanuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?