Stewart v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Robert E. Stewart
Defendant: Mr. Fletcher, Mr Montoya, Nevada Department of Corrections, James Ozurenda, State of Nevada and Mr West
Case Number: 2:2016cv02019
Filed: August 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting Defendants' 24 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' 25 Motion for Summary Judgment is Dismissed as moot and Plaintiff's Complaint is Dismissed without prejudice. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Extend Prison Copywork Limit. Plaintiff shall have his legal copywork limit extended by $100.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This case is removed from the inmate early mediation program. This case will return to the normal litigation track. The Clerk of Court shall issue summo nses for Defendants West and Montoya and deliver the same to the U.S. Marshal for service. Plaintiff shall have 30 days within which to furnish to the U.S. Marshal the required USM-285 forms. Service must be perfected within 90 days from the date of this order. The Clerk of the Court shall terminate the Attorney General's Office's limited notice of appearance for the purpose of conducting limited preservice discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Order mailed to Albert G. Peralta; two 285 forms and Order mailed to Plaintiff; Order and Complaint hand delivered to USM - SLD)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall electronically serve a copy of this order on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Traci Plotnick. Plaintiff shall serve his 10 interrogatories on the Attorney General's O ffice within 30 days from the date of this order. Within 45 days from the date of this order, the Attorney General's Office shall either file a limited notice of appearance on behalf of those defendants for the purpose of settlement or file a notice informing the Court about the status of the identities of "West" and "Montoya." Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - electronically served the Attorney General - SLD)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall electronically serve a copy of this order on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Traci Plotnick. The Attorney General's Office shall enter a limited notice of appearance on behalf of defendants and shall file a list of names of the employees who worked at Ely State Prison during September 2014 and October 2014 with some version of the name "West" or "Montoya" and their occupations at the time within 7 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - electronically served Traci Plotnick - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ozurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?