LHF Productions, Inc. v. Does
Plaintiff: LHF Productions, Inc.
Defendant: John Does
Case Number: 2:2016cv02028
Filed: August 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 184 defendant's motion for attorneys fees and costs is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Kabala is awarded costs in the amount of $3,526.98. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 197 LHF Productions, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys Fees is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. LHF is awarded $47,154 in attorneys fees under NRS § 41.670. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER AN AMENDED JUDGMENT accordingly. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration 187 is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Strike 205 is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Leave to Supplement 213 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER Granting 216 Stipulation to extend time re 213 motion. See Order for deadline. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/23/2019, nunc pro tunc 4/22/19. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER Granting 189 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 187 Motion for Reconsideration. Responses due by 10/9/2018. Replies due by 10/23/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 120 LHF's motion to dismiss Kabala's counterclaims is GRANTED in part, and 136 LHF's special motion under NRS 41.660 to dismiss Kabala's abuse-of-process counterclaim is GRANTED. Both of Kabala's counterclaims are DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 174 LHF's motion to voluntarily dismiss with prejudice its claims against Kabala is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 175 , 178 all other pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT accordingly and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Granting 176 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 174 , 175 Motions to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/6/2018. Replies due by 9/17/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting 162 Motion to Extend Time to Reply re: 151 Motion. Replies due by 7/6/2018. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 156 Stipulation; Re: 155 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 6/29/2018. Replies due by 7/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) Modified to correct Response and Reply deadlines on 6/19/2018 (SLD).
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Granting 148 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 146 Motion to Withdraw Constructive Admissions. Replies due by 6/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Granting 142 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ryan R Gile withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Granting 125 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 120 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/12/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Granting 124 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 112 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 2/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER. The Court STRIKES Docket No. 100 and instructs the parties to refrain from filing discovery documents on the docket in the future absent a Court order that they do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 92 the Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED; defendant Kabala's deadline to file an amended counterclaim is extended to 1/20/18, and the Clerk of Court is directed to STRIKE 96 Kabala's Amended Counterclaim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 93 the Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaim is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 94 the Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED without prejudice to the filing of a single motion to stay discovery. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that LHFs objection to Magistrate Judge Koppe's report and recommendation is OVERRULED, and 61 Magistrate Judge Koppe's report and recommendation is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED in part and REJECTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 28 LHF's motion to dismiss Kabala's counterclaims is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Kabala has until 11/14/17, to FILE an amended answer and counterclaim if he can allege sufficient true facts to cure the de ficiency outlined in this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 78 LHF's motion for default judgment is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 83 LHF's motion to voluntarily dismiss defendant Plain is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Denying 81 Motion for reconsideration and the motion to withdraw admissions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 86 the joint motion is GRANTED, and all claims against Ante Soda are DISMISSED, each party to bear its own fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 19 Ante Soda's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER. The Court hereby GRANTS 74 Mr. Kabala's motion to deem facts admitted and therefore ORDERS that the facts are deemed ADMITTED as requested at Docket No. 74 at 11-12 (first set of requests for admissions) and Docket No. 74 at 18 (second set of requests for admissions). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Denying 75 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 70 plaintiff's motion for voluntary dismissal is GRANTED; all claims in this action against Brian Kabala are DISMISSED. Kabala must advise this court by 8/14/17 whether he intends to proceed with his counterclaims 22 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 64 plaintiff's motion for default is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Recommending all defendants except Brian Kabala be SEVERED and DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff is ORDERED to promptly serve a copy of this order and report and recommendation on any defendant who has not yet appear ed, and shall file a proof of service of the same by June 20, 2017.ORDER that 58 Motion for Leave to file is granted; 60 motion for hearing is denied. Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 56 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to update the docket with Defendant's last known address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re 35 Order to Show Cause. The pending order to show cause is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying 47 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. The court will resolve LHF's motion to dismiss Kabala's counterclaim in the normal course. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re 33 , 35 Orders to Show Cause. To the extent any defendant wishes to do so, he or she may file a response to the orders to show cause by 5/11/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file a declaration whether the Rule 26(f) conference was held as required and, if so, why a discovery plan has not been filed. That declaration shall be filed by 5/11/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that this case is transferred to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy Koppe for all further proceedings. All future filings for this case must bear case number 2:16-cv-02028-JAD-NJK. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file a copy of this order in any future case that it files in this district that is related to the London Has Fallen copyright. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) Modified on 4/24/2017 to reflect correct Judge assignment (ADR).
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 25 Motion to Extend Time to Serve the Remaining Un-Served defendants. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LHF Productions, Inc. v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LHF Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?