Flemings v. University Medical Center
Plaintiff: Mundre L Flemings
Defendant: University Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2016cv02042
Filed: August 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re 50 Order. Plaintiff's case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk shall close the case and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss; Amended Complaint deadline: 21 days from date of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re 42 Stipulation for Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the proced ures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Plaintiff to call attorneys Robert Freeman and/or Danielle Miller at 702-893-3383 by August 25, 2017. The parties shall prepare and jointly file, by September 1, 2017, a joint proposed discovery plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. The parties are ORDERED to file, no later than 8/14/2017, either (1) a joint proposed discovery plan; or (2) a status report explaining why a proposed discovery plan should not be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 20 the Request to Reschedule Early Neutral Evaluation is GRANTED and the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference shall be continued to 8/15/17, at 9:30 a.m., in Chambers Room 3071. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the confidential statements (if not already submitted) shall submitted to theundersigned Magistrate Judge, in a sealed envelope marked confidential, no laterthan 4:00 p.m. 8/8/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Serve. The deadline to effectuate service is extended to 5/30/2017. Plaintiff may not serve by publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Plaintiff is instructed that service must be completed within 90 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flemings v. University Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mundre L Flemings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?