Cardinali v. Plusfour, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Louis A. Cardinali
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Plusfour, Inc., RC Willey Home Furnishings and Webbank/Dell Financial Services
Case Number: 2:2016cv02046
Filed: August 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 211 Experians motion for partial reconsideration is GRANTED. The portion of my 9/26/2019, 208 Order denying Experians motion for sanctions as moot is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Experian must file its renewed motion for sanctions by 4/9/2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on Experians motion will be held on 5/21/2021, at 10:00 am. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER denying 140 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 141 Motion to Certify Class; ORDER granting 144 Motion to Seal; ORDER granting 146 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion to Unseal; ORDER denying 166 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER denying 183 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1; ORDER granting 188 Motion to Seal; ORDER denying 190 Motion for Sanctions; ORDER denying 191 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER denying 192 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER granting 200 Motion to Seal; ORDER denying 203 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER granting 205 Motion for Leave to File Document; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Granting 194 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 190 Motion for Sanctions (First Request). Responses due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER re 158 Evidentiary Hearing. Exhibit List due by 5/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 160 , 161 the Firm's emergency objections to Magistrate Judge Koppes orders directing the Firm to appear for redeposition and setting the Firm's motion to compel for evidentiary hearing are OVERRULED, a nd 157 , 159 Judge Koppe's orders are AFFIRMED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 158 , 162 the Firm's emergency motions to stay its redeposition and the evidentiary hearing are DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER re: 130 Experian's Renewed Motion to Compel. The Court hereby SETS that motion for an evidentiary hearing at 1:30 p.m. on May 8, 2019, in Courtroom 3B. The Court further ORDERS Declarant Laura Ferranti to appear in person at that hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER re 152 Stipulation. ORDERED that the deadline for filing the joint pretrial order is suspended and it shall be due 30 days after a decision on the dispositive motions or further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER denying without prejudice Motions 98 , 99 , 100 , 101 , 107 , 112 , 113 , and 120 . No later than January 29, 2019, Experian shall file a renewed motion to compel. Any response shall be filed by February 5, 2019. Any reply shall be fil ed by February 8, 2019. No later than January 29, 2019, Experian shall file a renewed motion for sanctions. That motion shall be limited to that request for sanctions, and must be separate from the above motion to compel. Any response shall be filed by February 5, 2019. Any reply shall be filed by February 8, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 121 Motion to Remove Attorney Bradley T. Austin from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER re: 120 Motion for Leave to Supplement. Any response shall be filed by January 16, 2019, and any reply shall be filed by January 17, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 SCHEDULING ORDER granting 108 Stipulation. Motions due by 2/19/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/21/2019. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 103 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond/Reply re: 98 Motion to Compel and 99 Motion for Sanctions. Responses due by 12/7/2018. Replies due by 12/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 96 Stipulation re: 95 Order on Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Re: 85 Motion to Quash. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2018 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 88 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 85 Motion to Quash. Replies due by 8/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting 81 Third Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 1/7/2019. Motions due by 2/5/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/7/2019. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 78 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Discovery due by 10/8/2018. Motions due by 11/7/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 75 Stipulation. Discovery due by 8/8/2018. Motions due by 9/7/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER that 47 Motion to Transfer is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that a Hearing re 47 Motion to Transfer is set for 9/25/2017 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that the parties file, no later than December 9, 2016, either (1) a joint proposed discovery plan; or (2) a status report explaining why a proposed discovery plan should not be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardinali v. Plusfour, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis A. Cardinali
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC.
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plusfour, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RC Willey Home Furnishings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webbank/Dell Financial Services
Represented By: Zachary P. Takos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?