Soto v. Clark County School District
Plaintiff: Valerie Soto
Defendant: Clark County School District
Case Number: 2:2016cv02063
Filed: August 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 29:0794 Job Discrimination (Handicap)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 35 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Carlos L. McDade for Clark County School District substituted for Attorney Donna Mendoza-Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 7 defendant's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED, without prejudice. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 20 Witness List shall be STRICKEN by the Clerk. The Court ORDERS the parties and counsel to cease filing discovery documents on the docket. Failure to abide by this order and the applicable rules may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 6 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto v. Clark County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County School District
Represented By: Donna Mendoza-Mitchell
Represented By: Phoebe V Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Soto
Represented By: Gregory D. Ivie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?