Goldsmith v. Aargon Collection Agency, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Goldsmith
Defendant: Aargon Collection Agency, Inc. and Armand Fried
Case Number: 2:2016cv02066
Filed: August 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting 114 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, (ECF Nos. 48 , 52 , 64 , 81 , 82 , 83 , 84 ), as to Landeros, the Hegners, Pili, Mercado, Jackson, Phillips, and Serrata are GRANTED. Plaintiffs' FDCPA claims, as well as their related state law claims, are hereby dismissed without prejudice, with leave to amend in accordance with this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, (ECF No. 56 ), as to Smith is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Smith's claim under the NDPTA is dismissed with prejudice, and Smith's claim for civil conspiracy is dismissed without prejudice with leave to amend. Smith's FDCPA claim regarding the COJ Violations and the four untimely Writ of Execution Violations is dismissed without prejudice, and Smith's timely FDCPA claim concerning the fifth writ of execution and claim for abuse of process survive. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss, (ECF No. 60 ), as to Ch atman is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Chatman's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, (ECF No. 103 ), is GRANTED consistent with the foregoing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Landeros, the Hegners, Chatman, Pili, Mercado, Jac kson, Phillips, Serrata, and Smith shall file their amended complaints within twenty-one (21) days of this Order. With respect to Landeros, the Hegners, Chatman, Pili, Mercado, Jackson, Phillips, Serrata, failure to file an amended complaint by this time shall result in the Court dismissing their claims with prejudice and closing the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER that 108 Stipulation to Engage in Mediation and Set Depositions is DENIED as unnecessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 101 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 4/30/2018. Motions due by 5/30/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER. On May 4, 2017, the undersigned ordered the parties to file a joint statement as to the schedule by which these cases should proceed by May 11, 2017. Docket No. 70 . The parties have failed to comply. The Court again ORDERS, this time by May 16, 2017, that the parties file the joint statement as outlined in Docket No. 70 . Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 47 Order Consolidating Cases. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint statement as to the schedule by which these cases should proceed. In that joint statement, the parties shall include a deadline by which to file any motions for consolidation or bifurcation of trial. That joint statement shall be filed by May 11, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 OMNIBUS TRANSFER ORDER. FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs' attorney in these cases, Vernon Nelson, must file a copy of this Order in any future Fair Debt Collection Practices Act case he files against Aargon Collection Agency, Inc., and Arm and Fried in this district. A Motion Hearing re 17 MOTION to Consolidate and 27 Motion to Bifurcate is set for 5/4/2017 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 33 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Stephen A. Watkins substituted in place and stead of James Kevin Schultz for Armand Fried. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation to Extend Deadline re 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Responses due by 2/22/2017. Counsel is further ORDERED to immediately file in the other impacted cases a notice that the stipulation was granted in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldsmith v. Aargon Collection Agency, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aargon Collection Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armand Fried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Goldsmith
Represented By: Vernon Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?