Downing et al v. Wolfson et al
Plaintiff: Edwin Artiga, Jeffrey M Austin, Paul Barfield, Erick M. Brown, Alan D Daniels, Gaston Joseph Danjou, Curtis L. Downing, Jerry B Johnson, Demetrius Joseph, Jeffrey T. Lark, Scott Nichols, Oscar Perez-Marquez, Robert Reiger, Fabian F Rosas, Gary Shepard, Christopher Willing, Nicholas Willing, Kelvin Wilson and Elder Zacarias-Lopez
Defendant: Angela M Bello, Elko County Sheriffs Department, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Nye County Sheriffs Department, Mark Torvinen and Steven B. Wolfson
Case Number: 2:2016cv02131
Filed: September 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 54 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER that 42 Report and Recommendation is Accepted, 50 Plaintiff Curtis Downing's Objections are Overruled, and the complaint is dismissed without prejudice.FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs Curtis Downing, Erick Brown, Edwin Artiga, Fab ian Rosas, and Oscar Perez-Marquezs applications to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Nos. 10 , 14 , 23 , 33 , 34 ) are denied.FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall refund Nicholas Willing and Erick Brown's $400 filing fees. ECF Nos. 12 , 22 .FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc Finance - MMM)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that 45 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Objection re 42 Report and Recommendation is due by 6/30/2017. FURTHER ORDERED that 46 Motion to Exceed Page Limit is DENIED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that Plaintiffs Edwin Artiga, Oscar Perez-Marquez, Gaston Joseph Danjou, and Fabian F. Rosas' Motions to Extend Time (ECF No. 19 , 20 , 21 , 24 ) are GRANTED. Plaintiff Gaston Joseph Danjou's Motion for Documents Filed (ECF No. 35 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that the clerk of court shall return a copy of this order along with a copy of the certificate of interested parties (ECF No. 27 ), financial certificate (ECF No. 28 ), and letter (ECF No. 29 ) to Kelvin Wilson. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDERED that Leon McCoy's certificate of interested parties is a rogue document because Leon McCoy is not a plaintiff in this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall return a copy of this order along with a copy of the certificate of interested parties (ECF No. 25 ) to Leon McCoy. (Mailed 11/23/2016.) Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that Melvin Coleman's certificate of interested parties is a rogue document because Melvin Coleman is not a plaintiff in this action. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall return a copy of this order along with a copy of the certificate of interested parties (ECF No. 9 ) to Melvin Coleman. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 10/25/2016 to correct typo (MMM).
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that 3 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that by November 14, 2016, each of the plaintiffs must either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed without prepayment of fees, or (2) pay the full $400 fee for f iling a civil action (which includes the $350 filing fee and the $50 administrative fee). The plaintiffs are warned that each must sign his own court filings and none can sign for any other.FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs' fa ilure to timely comply with this order may result in this case being dismissed without prejudice.FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall file a certificate of interested parties as required by Local Rule 7.1-1 by November 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the clerk of the court must send the plaintiffs the approved form application to proceed without prepayment of fees. FURTHER ORDERED that by October 13, 2016, the plaintiffs must either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed wi thout prepayment of fees, or (2) pay the full $400 fee for filing a civil action (which includes the $350 filing fee and the $50 administrative fee). FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs' failure to timely comply with this order may result in this case being dismissed without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall file a certificate of interested parties as required by Local Rule 7.1-1 by October 13, 2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downing et al v. Wolfson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Artiga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan D Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaston Joseph Danjou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis L. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry B Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey T. Lark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Perez-Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Reiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian F Rosas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Willing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Willing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elder Zacarias-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela M Bello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elko County Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nye County Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Torvinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven B. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?