H&H Pharmaceuticals, LLC v. Chattem Chemicals, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: H&H Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Defendant: Chattem Chemicals, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. and Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02148
Filed: September 12, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Granting 185 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Joni A. Jamison terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/26/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
December 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 171 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 170 Objection to Report and Recommendation. Response to Objections to R&R due by 12/24/2024. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 12/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
November 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER. The Clerk of Court is kindly instructed to vacate the order granting in part and denying in part defendants' motion for attorney fees and costs (ECF No. 132 ). Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 11/14/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) Modified on 11/15/2024 (ALZ).
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend (ECF No. 157 ) is GRANTED to the extent Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint containing Count One of Plaintiff's proposed second amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must revise its proposed Second Amended Complaint and file the same within fourteen days of the date of this Order (11/27/2024). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' re sponse to what will be the Second Amended Complaint once filed is due fourteen days after it is filed. RECOMMENDATION - IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend be DENIED with respect to Counts Two, Three, and F our of Plaintiff's proposed Second Amended Complaint; provided, however, Plaintiff is not precluded from seeking the relief requested under Counts Two and Three as remedies under Count One. Objections to R&R due by 11/26/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/12/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that H&H Pharmaceuticals' 157 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that H&H Pharmaceuticals must file their Second Amended Complaint no later than August 15, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' responsive pleading is due no later than August 29, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/13/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting 155 Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiff to File its Motion for Leave to Amend. Motions due by 7/29/2024. Responses due by 8/26/2024. Replies due by 9/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/8/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting 145 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Eric Kohli added. Attorney Joseph A. Gutierrez terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 6/18/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 89 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER granting 104 Motion to Strike; ORDER denying 111 Motion; ORDER granting 112 Motion to Seal; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, (ECF No. 8 ), is DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is instructed to enter Judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/28/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 5/11/2022 at 10:00 AM. Brief due by 5/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/28/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 94 Stipulation Re: 89 Motion for Summary Judgment, Responses due by 1/11/2022. Replies due by 2/1/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 90 Stipulation Re: 89 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/4/2022. Replies due by 1/25/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Compel Discovery (ECF NO. 80 ) will be briefed in the ordinary course. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the dispositive motion and joint pretrial order deadlines are vacated pending further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Re: 73 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Compel Discovery. Video conference hearing set for 4/15/2021 at 02:30 PM. Responses due by 4/9/2021. No reply necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss. Second Amended Complaint deadline: due within 21 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Stipulation to Stay and Vacate Status Conference set for 10/9/18. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status hearing scheduled for 10:00 AM, 4/1/19, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Main Document 49 replaced on 10/9/2018) (ADR).
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 42 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Michael E Sullivan; Scott L. Hernandez and Julie Scheipeter terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Unopposed Motion for Out of State Counsel to Appear by Telephone at Status Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that the hearing scheduled for 2:00 PM, July 10, 2017 is RESCHEDULED to 2:00 PM, July 12, 2017, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Barry L. Breslow terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation to Stay Remaining Discovery. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 2:00 PM, 7/10/17, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 02/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 26 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation re 15 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (FRCP 12(b)(6).( Responses due by 11/15/2016.) Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 14 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 6 Stipulation to Extend Time. Chattem Chemicals, Inc. answer due 9/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H&H Pharmaceuticals, LLC v. Chattem Chemicals, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Chemicals, Inc.
Represented By: Barry L. Breslow
Represented By: Scott L. Hernandez
Represented By: Cicely Irene Lubben
Represented By: Michael E Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Scott L. Hernandez
Represented By: Cicely Irene Lubben
Represented By: Michael E Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&H Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Luis A Ayon
Represented By: Joseph A. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?