Manheimer v. Trufusion Yoga, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Seth Manheimer
Defendant: Michael Borden, Martin Hinton, Trufusion Franchising LLC, Trufusion LLC and Trufusion Yoga, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02186
Filed: September 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting 160 Stipulation re: 158 Motion for Judgment. Replies due by 4/5/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting 123 Stipulation re Discovery. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER that 84 Motion in Limine is DENIED; 85 Motion in Limine is DENIED as moot; 90 Amended Motion in Limine is DENIED; 89 Motion in Limine is DENIED; 87 Motion in Limine is GRANTED; 86 Motion in Limine is DENIED; and 93 Stipulation to Exclude and Limit Certain Proposed Exhibits and Evidence is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Re: 88 Motion for Leave to File Document. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to maintain the subject materials under seal for the time-being, but all of the subject documents will be unsealed absent the filing of a supplement addressing the concerns. That supplement shall be filed by 7/31/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting 103 Stipulation to Continue. Calendar Call continued to 8/8/2018 at 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Jury Trial continued to 8/13/2018 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that 38 defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 55 plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 17 defendants' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 41 plaintiff's and third-party defendants' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 37 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 19 Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint. Eddie Guerra answer due 12/5/2016; Rachel Hall answer due 12/5/2016; Seth Manheimer answer due 12/5/2016; Set and Flow Yoga LLC answer due 12/2/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manheimer v. Trufusion Yoga, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Borden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trufusion Franchising LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trufusion LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trufusion Yoga, LLC
Represented By: Jay A Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Manheimer
Represented By: Joanna Ardalan
Represented By: David R Koch
Represented By: William O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?