Boyle et al v. Hilton Hotels Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: William Bigelow, Michael Boyle, Darryl Dauenhauer, Horst Dziura, Gary Gregg, William Harland, Paul Houdayer, Christopher Nordling, William Sherlock and Ferenc Szony
Defendant: Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hilton Hotels Retirement Benefit Replacement Plan and Hilton Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan
Case Number: 2:2016cv02250
Filed: September 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than 1/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Plaintiff Gary Gregg ONLY. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Plaintiff Ferenc Szony ONLY. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Plaintiff Horst Dziura ONLY. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation of Dismissal re Christopher Nordling. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation of Dismissal re William Bigelow. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Mr. Woods and Mr. Dicarlo shall file a statement explaining the basis for their implicit representations that Mr. Woods maintains an office in Nevada and is a "resident" member of the bar. That statement must be filed by 5/4/2017. In lieu of that statement, Mr. Woods may comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 11-1(b) and Mr. Dicarlo may associate a proper resident member of the bar of this Court as local counsel by 5/4/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyle et al v. Hilton Hotels Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bigelow
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Trent L Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Boyle
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Trent L Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Dauenhauer
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Trent L Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horst Dziura
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Trent L Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Gregg
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Trent L Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Harland
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Trent L Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Houdayer
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Trent L Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Nordling
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Trent L Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Sherlock
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Trent L Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferenc Szony
Represented By: Mark J Bourassa
Represented By: Trent L Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Hotels Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Hotels Retirement Benefit Replacement Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?