Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Isla at South Shores Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Isla at South Shores Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv02275
Filed: September 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Denying 26 Motion to Dismiss and Granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines re 23 Order (Second Request). Motions due by 10/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines re 21 Scheduling Order. Motions due by 10/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Isla at South Shores Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Brett M Coombs
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isla at South Shores Homeowners Association
Represented By: David A. Clark
Represented By: Joseph P Garin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?