Shirehampton Drive Trust v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Shirehampton Drive Trust
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, MTC Financial Inc., Louisa Oakenell and United States of America
Counter Claimant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association and United States of America
Counter Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, MTC Financial Inc., Louisa Oakenell and Shirehampton Drive Trust
Case Number: 2:2016cv02276
Filed: September 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting Defendant United States of America's 42 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. The IRS may enforce its tax liens against the current owner of the property. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Shirehampton Drive Trust's [4 3]Motion for Summary Judgment Against Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. is GRANTED. The Court declares that Plaintiff Shirehampton Drive Trust acquired the property free and clear of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Banks deed of trust. IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank 's 44 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Shirehampton Drive Trust's 45 Motion for Summary Judgment Against Defendant United States of America is DENIED.The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/29/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 42 , 43 , 44 , and 45 Motions for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 11/13/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that this case is hereby STAYED. FURTHER ORDERED that 24 and 25 plaintiff Shirehampton Drive Trust's Motions for Summary Judgment are DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 26 and 27 Motions for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. The moving party shall have 21 days from the date of the Nevada Supreme Court's decision on the certified question to file a modified Motion for Summary Judgment or to file a notice renewing the previously filed motion. The opposing party shall have 21 days to respond. The moving party shall have 14 days to reply. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shirehampton Drive Trust v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Katie M. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: United States of America
Represented By: Boris Kukso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: MTC Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Louisa Oakenell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Shirehampton Drive Trust
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Represented By: Katie M. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisa Oakenell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Boris Kukso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirehampton Drive Trust
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?