Rosiere v. United States of America
Petitioner: |
Shaun Rosiere |
Respondent: |
United Sates of America |
Unknown: |
Jennifer S Wang |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv02286 |
Filed: |
September 28, 2016 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Peggy A. Leen |
Presiding Judge: |
Gloria M. Navarro |
Nature of Suit: |
Freedom of Information Act |
Cause of Action: |
05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 30, 2017 |
Filing
84
ORDER that 70 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 71 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter/Amend the Clerk's Judgement is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 23, 2017 |
Filing
79
ORDER that the Court certifies Plaintiff's appeal as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status is therefore REVOKED for purposes of this appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc 9th Circuit - MMM)
|
May 9, 2017 |
Filing
68
ORDER that 42 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint, (ECF No. 1 ), is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 24, 2017 |
Filing
64
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's 63 Motion to Resend any Sent Paper for the Last Few Months is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing
61
ORDER Granting 59 Motion to Extend Time re 42 Motion to Dismiss. ( Replies due by 11/23/2016.) Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
November 9, 2016 |
Filing
60
ORDER. Plaintiff Shaun Rosiere's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 37 ); Motion forDemand for Judgment (ECF No. 47 ); Motion to Stay Proceedings Motion for SummaryJudgment (ECF No. 48 ); Motion to Stay Proceedings (ECF No. 49 ); Motion t oWithdraw (ECF No. 53 ); Motion for Sanctions (ECF No. 55 ); Motion ChallengingJurisdiction of Colorado District Court (ECF No. 56 ); and Motion to Stay Motion toWithdraw Document (ECF No. 57 ), are DENIED without prejudice. Discovery and othe r proceedings in this case are stayed pending decision of the government's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No 42 ).A status hearing is set for February 7, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. The hearing will be vacated if the district judge has not yet decided the government's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 27, 2016 |
Filing
33
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO DISTRICT OF NEVADA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/27/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.]
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?