Sexton v. County of Clark Nevada (COCN) et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Lea Sexton
Defendant: Acevedo, Ryan Adams, CCDC Medical Administration, Unknown Cadet, J Chavez, City of Henderson, Nevada, City of Las Vegas, Clark County Detention Center, Unknown Delacruz, Unknown Goins, John Greggs, HDC Medical Administration, Henderson Detention Center, Unknown Hogan, Joseph Lombardo, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Unknown Macsucel, Chief Patrick Moers, Anthony Niswonger, R Robinson, C Smith, C. Smith, M Smith, Unknown Williamson, Charles Yannis and Unknown Zabszr
Case Number: 2:2016cv02289
Filed: September 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Granting 123 Amended Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Granting 121 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendants J Chavez, Joseph Lombardo, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Anthony Niswonger, R Robinson, Charles Yannis, Ryan Adams and F. Cadet re 8 Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying 46 Motion; ORDER denying 47 Motion; ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 70 Motion to Extend Time. The Court dismisses claims (see order for details). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 AMENDED ORDER to produce Amanda Lea Sexton for a motion hearing on 8/20/2018 at 3:30 PM in LV Courtroom 7C. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - placed in USM box - SLD) (Main Document 101 replaced on 8/6/2018) (BEL).
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER to produce Amanda Lea Sexton for a motion hearing on 8/20/2018 at 3:30 PM in LV Courtroom 7C. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - hand delivered to USM - SLD)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER that Plaintiff's 81 Motion to Stay Proceedings and Defendants' 97 Motion to Stay Case are GRANTED. Discovery is STAYED in this case pending a decision on 64 Motion. The pending Motions are DENIED without prejudice: 71 , 75 , 82 , 83 , 84 , 91 , and 92 . The hearing on the above referenced Motions scheduled for 2:00 PM, 7/2/2018 is VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that the 96 Order to Produce Plaintiff for a Motion Hearing is VACATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to send the Warden of Florence McClure Women's Correctional Center and the U.S. Marshal a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy placed in USM box; mailed to Warden - SLD)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 AMENDED ORDER to Produce Amanda Lea Sexton for a Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2018 at 2:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy placed in USM box; mailed to Florence McClure Women's Correctional Center Warden - SLD)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 USCA ORDER dismissing 55 Petition for Writ of Mandamus. JM
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED ORDER to Produce Amanda Lea Sexton. The Warden of Clark County Detention Center or his designee shall transport and produce Amanda Lea Sexton to appear for a motion hearing on 10/27/2017 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy placed in USM box - SLD)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER to Produce Amanda Lea Sexton. The Warden of Clark County Detention Center or his designee shall transport and produce Amanda Lea Sexton to appear for a motion hearing on 10/24/2017 at 12:30 PM in LV Courtroom 7D. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy placed in USM box - SLD)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER to Produce Amanda Lea Sexton for motion hearing on 10/13/2017 at 2:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy hand delivered to USM - SLD)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Denying 9 Motion to Strike. The 10 Motion to Direct Clerk to file Complaint is Denied.The 11 Motion to Add Assisting Inmate to Transaction Service List is Denied. The 13 , 14 , 17 , 18 , 21 , 22 Motions directing inmate-to-inma te correspondence are Denied without prejudice.The 12 , 19 Motions related to service are Denied.The 20 , 23 Motions for appointment of counsel are Denied and the 27 Motion for court action is Denied. A Status Hearing is set for 10/13/2017 at 2:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that if Plaintiff chooses to file a third amended complaint curing the deficiencies of her second amended complaint, as outlined in the November 18, 2016 screening order, Plaintiff shall file the third amended complaint within thirty (30) da ys from the date of entry of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send to Plaintiff the approved form for filing a § 1983 complaint, instructions for the same, and a copy of the November 18, 2016 screening order (ECF No . 5). FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff chooses not to file a third amended complaint curing the stated deficiencies of the second amended complaint (ECF No. 3), this action shall proceed on the second amended complaints Count II (Chavez, Robinson, Adams, and Niswonger), Counts III and IV (Adams, Gregg, Niswonger, M. Smith, Acevedo, Coker, Hogan, Delacruz, Goins, Macsucel, Cadet, C. Smith, Lombardo, and Williamson), Count V (Doe Defendants), Count VI (County of Clark Nevada, City of Las Vegas, LVMPD, Lombardo, and Yannis), and Count VII (Adams, Gregg, Niswonger, M. Smith, Acevedo, Coker, Hogan, Delacruz, Goins, Macsucel, Cadet, C. Smith, Lombardo, Williamson, and Moers) only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER. Directing clerk to docket 31 Order from case 16-cv-734 severed case as to Plaintiff Amanda Lea Sexton. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sexton v. County of Clark Nevada (COCN) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCDC Medical Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Cadet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Henderson, Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Delacruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Greggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDC Medical Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Macsucel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Patrick Moers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Niswonger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Yannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Zabszr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Lea Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?