Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Aleut Facilities Support Services, et al
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE GLAZING HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund and Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee
Defendant: ALEUT FACILITIES SUPPORT SERVICES, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., OCI Contracting Inc., Golden Nugget, Inc., Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company, Shac MT, LLC, Western Surety Company, Martin-Harris Construction, Inc., Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Plus Studios, LLC, Motion Properties Realty, Inc., DC Building Group, LLC, JHB Construction, Inc., Taylor Group, LLC, Aliante Gaming, LLC, American Contractors Indemnity Company, Summit Construction, Inc., Two Turnberry Place Condominium Association, George M. Raymundo Co., LV Tower 52 Management Co., LLC, SCI Construction, L.P., Wells Cargo, Inc., Sundance Builders, LLC, R.W. Rainey Construction, Inc., SGI Builders, JH Construction, LLC, Valley Health System, LLC, Robert Schuster, Prada USA Corp., Landry's Development, Inc., Sebeck Construction, LLC, CEI Construction, LLC, Board of Regents of the University of Nevada Las Vegas, John Oshei, Western National Mutual Insurance Company, Downtown Project, LLC, CCRP/AG BOFA Plaza Owner, LLC, Superior Building Group, LLC, Elite Glass & Mirror, Inc., Platte River Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, NABCO Entrances, Inc., City of Las Vegas, Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC, PWI Construction, Inc., CityCenter Holdings, LLC, Baker Construction, Inc., J & J Maintenance, Inc., Heller Companies, LLC, Prime Vet Inc., Design Options, Inc., Isaac Building and Design Co., Inc., Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC, Allegiant Air, LLC, R.W. Rainey Construction, Inc. formerly known as Rick Wayne Rainey doing business as RW Rainey Construction, Superior Building Group, LLC doing business as SBG, Design Options, Inc. doing business as Design Options Interiors, CityCenter Holdings, LLC doing business as City Center Residential Division, Diamond Resorts International, Inc. doing business as Polo Towers, Rick Wayne Rainey and CEI Construction, LLC doing business as CEI Builders
Case Number: 2:2016cv02297
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A Leen
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2017 Filing 56 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of defendants against plaintiffs. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 4/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting #52 Motion to Remove Attorney Lynda P. King from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #49 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re: Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 8/7/2017., Motions due by 9/6/2017., Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2017. All motions or stipulations to extend discovery shall be received no later than 7/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 2, 2017 Filing 52 MOTION to remove attorney(s) Lynda P. King from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Nevada Las Vegas. (King, Lynda)
March 1, 2017 Party Prime Vet Inc. terminated pursuant to #51 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
March 1, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
March 1, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE to Plead and Notice of Intent to Enter Default by Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
February 24, 2017 Filing 49 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re: Discovery Deadlines, filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Proposed Order (Defendant UNLV, With Prejudice. Board of Regents of the University of Nevada Las Vegas terminated. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 17, 2017 Party PWI Construction, Inc., CCRP/AG BOFA Plaza Owner, LLC and Hartford Fire Insurance Company terminated pursuant to #46 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
February 17, 2017 Filing 47 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Proposed Order (Defendant UNLV, With Prejudice by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
February 17, 2017 Filing 46 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
February 6, 2017 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to #33 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, filed by Defendant CityCenter Holdings, LLC. (Mead, Leon)
February 6, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The Complaint in this action was filed on 9/30/2016. To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to PWI Construction, Inc.. FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 3/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 3, 2017 Party DC Building Group, LLC terminated pursuant to #43 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
February 3, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
January 31, 2017 Filing 42 RESPONSE to #33 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,, filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. Replies due by 2/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Smith, Wesley)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting #40 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of City of Las Vegas. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) Modified on 1/31/2017 to add with prejudice(TR).
January 27, 2017 Party City of Las Vegas terminated pursuant to #39 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
January 27, 2017 Filing 40 STIPULATION of Dismissal of City of Las Vegas by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
January 27, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. of Certain Defendants ONLY (Smith, Wesley)
January 27, 2017 Filing 38 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Design Options, Inc., Isaac Building and Design Co., Inc., LV Tower 52 Management Co., LLC, Motion Properties Realty, Inc., Prime Vet Inc., R.W. Rainey Construction Inc. re #37 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (JM)
January 26, 2017 Filing 37 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default; filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
January 20, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE of Joinder in Motion re #33 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC . (Mead, Leon)
January 20, 2017 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent MGM Resorts International, Inc. for Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC added. . (Mead, Leon)
January 20, 2017 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by CityCenter Holdings, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Mead, Leon)
January 20, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Defendant CityCenter Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 2/3/2017. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/6/2017. (Mead, Leon) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 17, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE to Plead and Notice of Intent to Enter Default by Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
January 13, 2017 Party Elite Glass & Mirror, Inc., JHB Construction, Inc., John Oshei, Plus Studios, LLC, SCI Construction, L.P., Taylor Group, LLC, American Contractors Indemnity Company and Diamond Resorts International, Inc. terminated pursuant to #31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
January 13, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. of Certain Defendants Only (Smith, Wesley)
January 6, 2017 Party SGI Builders terminated pursuant to #30 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
January 6, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. of Certain Defendants Only (Smith, Wesley)
January 4, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE to Plead and Notice of Intent to Enter Default by Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
December 29, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (JM)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER re #26 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/8/2017. Motions due by 6/7/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 22, 2016 Filing 26 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust . (Smith, Wesley)
December 22, 2016 Party Martin-Harris Construction, Inc., Two Turnberry Place Condominium Association, Baker Construction, Inc. and Downtown Project, LLC terminated per #25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (ADR)
December 21, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
December 21, 2016 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee. American Contractors Indemnity Company served on 12/19/2016, answer due 1/9/2017; Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company served on 12/19/2016, answer due 1/9/2017; Diamond Resorts International, Inc. served on 10/18/2016, answer due 11/8/2016; Elite Glass & Mirror, Inc. served on 10/25/2016, answer due 11/15/2016; Heller Companies, LLC served on 12/19/2016, answer due 1/9/2017; JH Construction, LLC served on 12/19/2016, answer due 1/9/2017; SCI Construction, L.P. served on 10/18/2016, answer due 11/8/2016; SGI Builders served on 12/20/2016, answer due 1/10/2017; Taylor Group, LLC served on 10/25/2016, answer due 11/15/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Wesley)
December 20, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE to Plead and Notice of Intent to Enter Default by Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) re #1 Complaint. Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC answer due 1/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 16, 2016 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Board of Regents of the University of Nevada Las Vegas. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (King, Lynda)
December 16, 2016 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Board of Regents of the University of Nevada Las Vegas.(King, Lynda)
December 14, 2016 Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) #1 Complaint by Defendant Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC. (Garcia, Jill)
December 7, 2016 Party Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company, J & J Maintenance, Inc., R.W. Rainey Construction, Inc., Robert Schuster, Sebeck Construction, LLC, Shac MT, LLC, Sundance Builders, LLC, Aliante Gaming, LLC and CEI Construction, LLC terminated pursuant to #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
December 7, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. of Certain Defendants Only (Smith, Wesley)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request). Defendant Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC's response to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint due 12/14/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/01/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 30, 2016 Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re #1 Complaint by Defendant Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC. (Martin, Anthony)
November 21, 2016 Party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, NABCO Entrances, Inc., OCI Contracting Inc., Western National Mutual Insurance Company, Aleut Facilities Support Services and George M. Raymundo Co. terminated pursuant to #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
November 21, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. of Certain Defendants Only (Smith, Wesley)
November 18, 2016 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee. Board of Regents of the University of Nevada Las Vegas served on 10/17/2016, answer due 11/7/2016; CCRP/AG BOFA Plaza Owner, LLC served on 10/18/2016, answer due 11/8/2016; CEI Construction, LLC served on 10/17/2016, answer due 11/7/2016; City of Las Vegas served on 10/17/2016, answer due 11/7/2016; CityCenter Holdings, LLC served on 10/13/2016, answer due 11/3/2016; DC Building Group, LLC served on 10/17/2016, answer due 11/7/2016; Design Options, Inc. served on 10/18/2016, answer due 11/8/2016; Isaac Building and Design Co., Inc. served on 10/17/2016, answer due 11/7/2016; JHB Construction, Inc. served on 10/31/2016, answer due 11/21/2016; LV Tower 52 Management Co., LLC served on 10/14/2016, answer due 11/4/2016; Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC served on 10/18/2016, answer due 11/8/2016; Motion Properties Realty, Inc. served on 10/17/2016, answer due 11/7/2016; Platte River Insurance Company served on 11/17/2016, answer due 12/8/2016; Plus Studios, LLC served on 10/20/2016, answer due 11/10/2016; Prada USA Corp. served on 10/13/2016, answer due 11/3/2016; Prime Vet Inc. served on 10/24/2016, answer due 11/14/2016; R.W. Rainey Construction, Inc. served on 10/24/2016, answer due 11/14/2016; Robert Schuster served on 10/31/2016, answer due 11/21/2016; Sebeck Construction, LLC served on 10/21/2016, answer due 11/11/2016; Shac MT, LLC served on 11/3/2016, answer due 11/24/2016; Valley Health System, LLC served on 10/18/2016, answer due 11/8/2016; Western Surety Company served on 10/19/2016, answer due 11/9/2016; Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC served on 10/13/2016, answer due 11/30/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Wesley)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting ECF No. #12 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendant Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Second Request). Defendant Westgate's Response/Answer due 11/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 17, 2016 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Complaint by Defendant Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC. (Garcia, Jill)
November 11, 2016 Party Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc., Landry's Development, Inc., Platte River Insurance Company, Summit Construction, Inc., Superior Building Group, LLC, Wells Cargo, Inc., Western Surety Company, Allegiant Air, LLC and Golden Nugget, Inc. terminated pursuant to #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
November 11, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. of Certain Defendants Only (Smith, Wesley)
November 7, 2016 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by City of Las Vegas. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/22/2016.(Eslinger, Jack) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint. Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC answer due 11/17/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/3/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 3, 2016 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint by Defendant Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC. (Martin, Anthony)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint. Aleut Facilities Support Services answer due 11/17/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/2/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 31, 2016 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint by Defendant Aleut Facilities Support Services. (Roskelley, Rick)
October 6, 2016 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Aleut Facilities Support Services, Aliante Gaming, LLC, Allegiant Air, LLC, American Contractors Indemnity Company, Baker Construction, Inc., Board of Regents of the University of Nevada Las Vegas, CCRP/AG BOFA Plaza Owner, LLC, CEI Construction, LLC, City of Las Vegas, CityCenter Holdings, LLC, Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company, DC Building Group, LLC, Design Options, Inc., Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Downtown Project, LLC, Elite Glass & Mirror, Inc., George M. Raymundo Co., Golden Nugget, Inc., Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc., Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Heller Companies, LLC, Isaac Building and Design Co., Inc., J & J Maintenance, Inc., JH Construction, LLC, JHB Construction, Inc., LV Tower 52 Management Co., LLC, Landry's Development, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC, Martin-Harris Construction, Inc., Motion Properties Realty, Inc., NABCO Entrances, Inc., OCI Contracting Inc., John Oshei, PWI Construction, Inc., Platte River Insurance Company, Plus Studios, LLC, Prada USA Corp., Prime Vet Inc., R.W. Rainey Construction, Inc., SCI Construction, L.P., SGI Builders, Robert Schuster, Sebeck Construction, LLC, Shac MT, LLC, Summit Construction, Inc., Sundance Builders, LLC, Superior Building Group, LLC, Taylor Group, LLC, Two Turnberry Place Condominium Association, Valley Health System, LLC, Wells Cargo, Inc., Western National Mutual Insurance Company, Western Surety Company, Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC. (JM)
October 5, 2016 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued , filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons, #41 Summons, #42 Summons, #43 Summons, #44 Summons, #45 Summons, #46 Summons, #47 Summons, #48 Summons, #49 Summons, #50 Summons, #51 Summons, #52 Summons, #53 Summons, #54 Summons)(Smith, Wesley)
October 4, 2016 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon, on 10/4/2016. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
September 30, 2016 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (JM)
September 30, 2016 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE GLAZING HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE IUPAT INDUSTRY PENSION TRUST FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE IUPAT POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, ARIZONA, COLORADO, AND SOUTHERN NEVADA GLAZIERS, ARCHITECTURAL METAL AND GLASS WORKERS PENSION TRUST FUND, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Smith, Wesley)
September 30, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4307511), filed by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE IUPAT INDUSTRY PENSION TRUST FUND, Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE GLAZING HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, ARIZONA, COLORADO, AND SOUTHERN NEVADA GLAZIERS, ARCHITECTURAL METAL AND GLASS WORKERS PENSION TRUST FUND, Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE IUPAT POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE. Proof of service due by 12/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Smith, Wesley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Aleut Facilities Support Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE GLAZING HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Southern California, Arizona, Colorado, and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Southern nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the IUPAT Political Action Committee
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEUT FACILITIES SUPPORT SERVICES
Represented By: Rick D Roskelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCI Contracting Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Nugget, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shac MT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin-Harris Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plus Studios, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Properties Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DC Building Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JHB Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliante Gaming, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Contractors Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Turnberry Place Condominium Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George M. Raymundo Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LV Tower 52 Management Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI Construction, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Cargo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundance Builders, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.W. Rainey Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGI Builders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JH Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Health System, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prada USA Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landry's Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sebeck Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEI Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Nevada Las Vegas
Represented By: Lynda P. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Oshei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western National Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downtown Project, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCRP/AG BOFA Plaza Owner, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Building Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Glass & Mirror, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platte River Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NABCO Entrances, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas
Represented By: Jack O Eslinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC
Represented By: Leon F Mead, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PWI Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CityCenter Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Leon F Mead, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J Maintenance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heller Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Vet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Design Options, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Building and Design Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Represented By: Jill Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegiant Air, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.W. Rainey Construction, Inc. formerly known as Rick Wayne Rainey doing business as RW Rainey Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Building Group, LLC doing business as SBG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Design Options, Inc. doing business as Design Options Interiors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CityCenter Holdings, LLC doing business as City Center Residential Division
Represented By: Leon F Mead, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International, Inc. doing business as Polo Towers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Wayne Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEI Construction, LLC doing business as CEI Builders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?