Winston v. Dollar Loan Center, LLC
Plaintiff: Qairess Winston
Defendant: Dollar Loan Center, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02309
Filed: October 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation for extension of time for Defendant to file its Early Neutral Evaluation Statement re 8 Order Scheduling Early Neutral Evaluation Session. The time is extended from Tuesday, 1/17/2017 to Thursday, 1/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Stipulation re 7 MOTION for More Definite Statement, 6 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 11/28/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winston v. Dollar Loan Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Loan Center, LLC
Represented By: Dora V. Lane
Represented By: Peter D. Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qairess Winston
Represented By: John C. Courtney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?