Slack et al v. Parball Newco LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edward Champa, Andrew Craig, Tony Exposito, Shawn Kelley, Scott Kleven, Gurminder Singh, William Slack, Harry Strock, Michael Sugarman, Milton Turner and Vicky Woodruff
Defendant: PHWLV, LLC, Parball Corp., Parball LLC and Parball Newco LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02324
Filed: October 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Granting 151 Second Stipulation to Stay Case until 10/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Granting 148 Stipulation to Stay Case until 9/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDERED that a hearing is set for Tuesday, August 14, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3C on the following motions:Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel the Names of the Opt-In Plaintiffs from Whom Plaintiffs Have Obtained Declarations and fo r Sanctions (ECF No. 112 ); Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Limiting Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice and for Sanctions (ECF No. 115 );Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel a Deposition Pursuant to FRCP Rule 30(b)(6) and to Extend the Time to Hold Such Deposition (ECF No. 120 ); and Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order (ECF No. 123). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Granting 105 Stipulation to Continue Hearing Re: 62 , 73 , 74 , 76 , 78 , 85 , and 89 Motions. Motions Hearing continued to 6/5/2018 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 93 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 90 Motion for circulation. Plaintiffs' Replies due by 4/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 53 Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery Requests. The parties must meet and confer and file a joint status report and an amended discovery plan and scheduling order by 4/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 73 Motion to Compel. Replies due by 1/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 69 Stipulation to Modify and Extend Deadlines (First Request). Discovery due by 3/30/2018. Motions due by 4/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 66 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 62 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Defendants' Replies due by 11/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 63 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 62 MOTION to Compel. Responses due by 10/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 56 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 53 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs' Responses due by 8/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Stipulation for Conditional Certification re 35 MOTION for Circulation of Notice of the Pendency of this Action. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slack et al v. Parball Newco LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Champa
Represented By: Leon Marc Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Craig
Represented By: Leon Marc Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Exposito
Represented By: Leon Marc Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Kelley
Represented By: Leon Marc Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Kleven
Represented By: Leon Marc Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurminder Singh
Represented By: Leon Marc Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Slack
Represented By: Leon Marc Greenberg
Represented By: Dana Sniegocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Strock
Represented By: Leon Marc Greenberg
Represented By: Dana Sniegocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sugarman
Represented By: Leon Marc Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Turner
Represented By: Leon Marc Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Woodruff
Represented By: Leon Marc Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHWLV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parball Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parball LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parball Newco LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?