Bank of America, N.A., v. Solera at Stallion Mountain Unit Owners' Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.,
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc., SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Solera at Stallion Mountain Unit Owners' Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv02339
Filed: October 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 104 Stipulation of Dismissal; Solera at Stallion Mountain Unit Owners' Association terminated. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 68 BANA's motion for partial summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 69 SFR's motion for partial summary judgment be, and the same her eby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 70 the SFR's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 71 the HOA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 73 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 68 , 69 , 70 , and 71 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/13/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER that a preclusion order is entered precluding Bank of America from using any documents, evidence or information not timely disclosed, or from calling a witness to supply testimony on information or documents not disclosed, in motion practice, at a hearing or at trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 56 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 53 MOTION for Protective Order. SFR's Responses due by 7/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's 34 Motion for Service by Publication as to Paul O. Parton and Granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Cross-Claim as to Paul O. Parton. The time for service is extended by an additional 60 days from the date of this order is entered to allow SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC to effectuate service by publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying 40 Stipulation to Stay Litigation Pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Certiorari to the United States Supreme Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's 16 Motion to Certify a Question of Law to Nevada's Supreme Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that 10 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall post security in the amount of $500.00 within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A., v. Solera at Stallion Mountain Unit Owners' Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.,
Represented By: Brett M Coombs
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solera at Stallion Mountain Unit Owners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?